Global Patent Index - EP 1284342 A3

EP 1284342 A3 2003-06-25 - Oil collecting device for an internal combustion engine, particularly a boxer engine

Title (en)

Oil collecting device for an internal combustion engine, particularly a boxer engine

Title (de)

Ölauffangvorrichtung für eine Brennkraftmaschine, insbesondere für einen Boxermotor

Title (fr)

Dispositif de collecte de l'huile pour un moteur à combustion interne, particulierement pour un moteur à cylindres opposés

Publication

EP 1284342 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 02014379 A

Priority

DE 10139709 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1284342A2] Oil sump device comprises an oil sump housing arranged underneath a crank housing and containing an oil extraction chamber from which lubricating oil is conveyed to consumers via a main oil pump provided with an oil suction line. Lubricating oil from the consumers is recycled via an oil line to at least one oil collection chamber adjoining the oil extraction chamber. The oil extraction chamber is separated from the oil collection chamber by at least one wall section having at least one through opening (48, 50) controlled by a flap (52, 54) via which the lubricating oil can pass from the oil collection chamber into the oil extraction chamber. The wall section provided with the through opening is designed as an insertable oil bulkhead wall (22, 24) inserted between guide ribs (40, 42) provided in the oil sump housing.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01M 11/00; F01M 11/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01M 1/06 (2006.01); F01M 11/00 (2006.01); F01M 11/02 (2006.01); F01M 13/04 (2006.01); F02B 75/24 (2006.01); F02F 7/00 (2006.01); F02B 75/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01M 11/02 (2013.01); F01M 11/0004 (2013.01); F02B 75/243 (2013.01); F02B 2075/1824 (2013.01); F05C 2225/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1284342 A2 20030219; EP 1284342 A3 20030625; EP 1284342 B1 20041208; DE 10139709 A1 20030227; JP 2003065022 A 20030305; US 2003042078 A1 20030306; US 6823968 B2 20041130

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20180103

2018-01-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50201713

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160721

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120628

2013-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120702

2013-03-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130228

2013-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120628

2013-02-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120628

2011-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110623

- Year of fee payment: 10

2011-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110620

- Year of fee payment: 10

2011-07-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110630

- Year of fee payment: 10

2011-04-27 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20110331 AND 20110406

2011-04-06 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20110310 AND 20110316

2011-02-04 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2009-11-27 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2009-07-10 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2005-11-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050909

2005-08-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-05-04 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050407

2005-01-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50201713 P 20050113

2005-01-12 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-12-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-12-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-03-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-03-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031229

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-06-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 01M 11/00 A

2003-06-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 01M 11/02 B

2003-02-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-02-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI