Global Patent Index - EP 1284635 A4

EP 1284635 A4 2003-06-04 - ENDOSCOPIC ACCESSORY ATTACHMENT MECHANISM

Title (en)

ENDOSCOPIC ACCESSORY ATTACHMENT MECHANISM

Title (de)

ENDOSKOPISCHER ZUSATZGERÄTEKOPPLUNGSMECHANISMUS

Title (fr)

MECANISME DE FIXATION D'UN ACCESSOIRE ENDOSCOPIQUE

Publication

EP 1284635 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 01933429 A

Priority

  • US 0140728 W
  • US 20415500 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0187144A1] The present invention provides a mechanism for attaching accessory devices to the distal end of an endoscope or catheter. The engagement mechanism comprises a bracing member (392) that engages a surface of the endoscope (20) and a ramp surface (360), which applies a gripping force to an opposing surface of the endoscope, preferably through a wedge member (372). The bracing member (392) may comprise an elongate element that extends partially into the working channel of the endoscope or may comprise an element that engages a portion of the total circumference of the outside surface of the endoscope. The ramp surface (360) is inclined at an acute angle from the longitudinal axis of the endoscope and preferably engages with a slidable wedge in a cooperative arrangement that serves to reduce the distance between the wedge (372) and the bracing member (392) as the wedge slides on the ramp to engage a portion of the endoscope therebetween.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61B 1/00; A61B 1/018

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G02B 23/24 (2006.01); A61B 1/00 (2006.01); A61B 1/018 (2006.01); A61B 17/04 (2006.01); A61B 17/12 (2006.01); A61B 17/06 (2006.01); A61B 17/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61B 1/00087 (2013.01); A61B 1/018 (2013.01); A61B 17/0469 (2013.01); A61B 17/0482 (2013.01); A61B 17/0401 (2013.01); A61B 2017/0417 (2013.01); A61B 2017/06052 (2013.01); A61B 2017/061 (2013.01); A61B 2017/306 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0187144 A1 20011122; DE 60115020 D1 20051222; DE 60115020 T2 20060803; EP 1284635 A1 20030226; EP 1284635 A4 20030604; EP 1284635 B1 20051116; ES 2252231 T3 20060516; JP 2003533257 A 20031111; US 2003171651 A1 20030911; US 6869395 B2 20050322

INPADOC legal status


2018-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180502

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20180601

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20180329

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-04-11 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170522

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170413

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-04-13 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-12 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2006-10-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060817

2006-07-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2252231 T3

2005-12-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60115020 P 20051222

2005-11-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2005-11-16 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-06-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040420

2004-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-06-04 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20030417

2003-06-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61B 1/00 A

2003-06-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61B 1/018 B

2003-02-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021204

2003-02-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-02-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR