Global Patent Index - EP 1286129 B8

EP 1286129 B8 2007-10-31 - Incendiary munition for a flight stabilised penetrating projectile

Title (en)

Incendiary munition for a flight stabilised penetrating projectile

Title (de)

Brandsatz für ein flügelstabilisiertes Wuchtgeschoss

Title (fr)

Munition incendiaire pour un projectile pénétrant stabilisé par empennage

Publication

EP 1286129 B8 (DE)

Application

EP 02012954 A

Priority

DE 10140600 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1286129A1] An incendiary composition (14) comprises titanium sponge (in wt.%) (85-96) and an epoxide resin or a polyester resin (4-15), and has a density of 1.7-2.8 g/cm3. The incendiary composition is provided in a tail region (8) of a fin-stabilized kinetic energy projectile, and upon impact with a target (13), enters the target as a separate unit behind the penetrator (2) of the projectile.

[origin: EP1286129A1] An incendiary composition (14) comprises titanium sponge (in wt.%) (85-96) and an epoxide resin or a polyester resin (4-15), and has a density of 1.7-2.8 g/cm<3>. The incendiary composition is provided in a tail region (8) of a fin-stabilized kinetic energy projectile, and upon impact with a target (13), enters the target as a separate unit behind the penetrator (2) of the projectile.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F42B 12/44 (2006.01); C06B 45/00 (2006.01); C06C 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C06B 45/00 (2013.01); C06C 15/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1286129 A1 20030226; EP 1286129 B1 20070926; EP 1286129 B8 20071031; DE 10140600 A1 20030306; DE 50210961 D1 20071108; IL 151292 A 20061005; IL 151292 D0 20030410; US 2003034102 A1 20030220; US 2005230016 A1 20051020; US 6849140 B2 20050201

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170621

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170621

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170620

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-06-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-06-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2008-09-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080627

2007-12-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-12-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20071108

2007-11-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50210961 P 20071108

2007-10-10 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: RHEINMETALL WAFFE MUNITION GMBH

2007-09-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2007-09-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-08-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050701

2003-11-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-02-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020924

2003-02-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-02-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-02-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI