Global Patent Index - EP 1286361 A3

EP 1286361 A3 2003-06-04 - Container for storing and transporting goods, in particular dangerous materials

Title (en)

Container for storing and transporting goods, in particular dangerous materials

Title (de)

Container für die Lagerung und den Transport von Gütern, insbesondere von Gefahrstoffen

Title (fr)

Conteneur de stockage et de transport de marchandises, en particulier de matériaux dangereux

Publication

EP 1286361 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 02010277 A

Priority

DE 20113446 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1286361A2] A single door (12) is connected by hinges (14) with at least two parallel axes of rotation to a door frame (16) of the container (10)

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G21F 5/12; B65D 90/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 88/12 (2006.01); B65D 90/00 (2006.01); E05B 83/02 (2014.01); E05C 5/04 (2006.01); G21F 5/005 (2006.01); E05B 83/10 (2014.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 90/0086 (2013.01); B65D 88/121 (2013.01); E05B 83/02 (2013.01); E05C 5/04 (2013.01); G21F 5/005 (2013.01); E05B 83/10 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

DE 20113446 U1 20011031; EP 1286361 A2 20030226; EP 1286361 A3 20030604

INPADOC legal status


2012-11-28 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20120607

2007-12-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20071115

2004-06-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: TSU GMBH, STAHL-, MASCHINEN- UND ANLAGENBAU

2004-02-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031022

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-02-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-02-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-02-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI