Global Patent Index - EP 1288553 A8

EP 1288553 A8 2003-06-25 - Cable for supplying fluid, electricity and optical waves to an industrial robot

Title (en)

Cable for supplying fluid, electricity and optical waves to an industrial robot

Title (de)

Versorgungskabel mit Fluid-, Strom und Lichtwellenleitungen für einen Industrieroboter

Title (fr)

Câble d'alimentation pouvant conduire un fluide, du courant et des ondes optiques pour un robot industriel

Publication

EP 1288553 A8 (DE)

Application

EP 02019279 A

Priority

DE 20114231 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1288553A1] Industrial robots require the provision of different power and signal services to a common point ,e.g. hand gripper. The power line has a pneumatic hose (12) at the core and around this is a multi layer structure within which are a mix of electrical wires (24-32) and optical fibre conductors (20). Strainer wires (44) provide a mechanical load carrying capacity.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F16L 11/127; B25J 19/00; G02B 6/44; H01B 7/00; H02B 11/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B23K 26/08 (2006.01); B23K 26/10 (2006.01); B25J 19/00 (2006.01); G02B 6/44 (2006.01); H01B 7/00 (2006.01); H01B 11/22 (2006.01); H02G 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B23K 26/0884 (2013.01); B25J 19/0029 (2013.01); B25J 19/0037 (2013.01); G02B 6/4416 (2013.01); G02B 6/4427 (2013.01); H01B 7/0072 (2013.01); H01B 11/22 (2013.01); H02G 11/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

EPO simple patent family

DE 20114231 U1 20011129; EP 1288553 A1 20030305; EP 1288553 A3 20031210; EP 1288553 A8 20030625

INPADOC legal status


2008-09-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080311

2005-04-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050310

2004-09-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-12-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-12-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-11-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030902

2003-05-28 [D17D] SEARCH REPORT (DELETED)

2003-05-28 [RA1] DATE AND KIND OF FIRST PUBLICATION (CORRECTION)

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

2003-05-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SCHUETZ, LOTHAR

2003-03-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-03-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-03-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI