Global Patent Index - EP 1288980 B1

EP 1288980 B1 2007-10-31 - Circuit breaker with a detachable connection between a switching contact and its driving device and method for mounting and demounting the switching contact

Title (en)

Circuit breaker with a detachable connection between a switching contact and its driving device and method for mounting and demounting the switching contact

Title (de)

Leistungsschalter mit einer lösbaren Verbindung zwischen einer Schaltkontaktanordnung und einer diese betätigenden Antriebsvorrichtung sowie Verfahren zum Aus- und Einbau der Schaltkontaktanordnung

Title (fr)

Disjoncteur avec un assemblage détachable entre un contact de commutation et son dispositif d'actionnement ainsi que procédé pour monter et démonter le contact de commutation

Publication

EP 1288980 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 02090179 A

Priority

DE 10144106 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE10144106C1] The switch has an electrical contact device with a contact carrier having a coupling bolt for providing a pivot connection with a lever device of the switch operating drive, a clamping element (28) holding the switch shaft (8) of the operating drive in a fixed position, for removal and replacement of the contact device. An Independent claim for a method for removal and fitting of an electrical contact device for a power switch is also included.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 11/00 (2013.01); H01H 2001/001 (2013.01); H01H 2300/066 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 10144106 C1 20030130; DE 50211130 D1 20071213; EP 1288980 A2 20030305; EP 1288980 A3 20041124; EP 1288980 B1 20071031; US 2003057067 A1 20030327; US 6657524 B2 20031202

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121201

2013-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120531

2013-03-14 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50211130

- Effective date: 20121201

2013-03-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130131

2011-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110718

- Year of fee payment: 10

2011-07-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110530

- Year of fee payment: 10

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090523

2008-11-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080528

- Year of fee payment: 7

2008-10-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080801

2008-03-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-12-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50211130 P 20071213

2007-10-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2005-08-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2005-02-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20041220

2004-11-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-11-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-03-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-03-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-03-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI