Global Patent Index - EP 1290218 B8

EP 1290218 B8 2007-10-03 - ENDOMETRIOSIS-RELATED MARKERS AND USES THEREOF

Title (en)

ENDOMETRIOSIS-RELATED MARKERS AND USES THEREOF

Title (de)

ENDOMETRIOSE MARKER UND VERWENDUNG DERSELBEN

Title (fr)

MARQUEURS DE L'ENDOMETRIOSE ET UTILISATIONS DE CEUX-CI

Publication

EP 1290218 B8 (EN)

Application

EP 01909382 A

Priority

  • CA 0100245 W
  • US 18506300 P
  • US 22574500 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0162959A2] The present invention relates to markers of endometriosis which are differentially expressed in the endometrial cells of females with endometriosis compared to endometriosis-free females. The invention also relates to methods for determining likelihood of endometriosis in female subjects, to methods for grading endometriosis in females suffering from endometriosis and to methods for treating this disease. The invention is also concerned with polynucleotides, probes, primers and kits useful for reducing into practice the above-mentioned methods which are more rapid, non invasive, much less complicated and much less costly than laparoscopy.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12Q 1/68 (2006.01); G01N 33/53 (2006.01); C12N 15/09 (2006.01); G01N 33/68 (2006.01); G01N 37/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12Q 1/6883 (2013.01); C12Q 2600/158 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0162959 A2 20010830; WO 0162959 A3 20030103; AT 365227 T 20070715; AU 3717801 A 20010903; BR 0108685 A 20031230; CA 2399259 A1 20010830; DE 60129018 D1 20070802; DE 60129018 T2 20080221; DE 60140580 D1 20091231; EP 1290218 A2 20030312; EP 1290218 B1 20070620; EP 1290218 B8 20071003; ES 2287100 T3 20071216; ES 2336817 T3 20100416; JP 2003531580 A 20031028; US 2002127555 A1 20020912; US 2006057584 A1 20060316; US 2012208869 A1 20120816; US 6777182 B2 20040817; US 8148061 B2 20120403; US 8541173 B2 20130924

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160226

2017-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160229

2016-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160226

2016-11-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20161028

2016-10-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160226

2016-04-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150227

2016-04-01 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20160401

2016-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150901

2015-09-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60129018

2015-05-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150212

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-05-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150211

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150228

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-02-12 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-08-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140417

- Year of fee payment: 14

2014-05-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20140324

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100226

2010-08-31 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070620

2010-07-30 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080226

2009-07-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070620

2009-02-27 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070620

2009-01-30 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080226

2008-10-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080228

2008-05-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080325

2008-04-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070620

2008-04-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070921

2008-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070620

2008-01-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071120

2008-01-02 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070620

2007-12-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2007-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2287100 T3

2007-12-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2007-11-24 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070620

2007-11-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-10-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: SIEMENS MEDICAL SOLUTIONS DIAGNOSTICS

- Effective date: 20070801

2007-09-20 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070920

2007-08-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60129018 P 20070802

2007-08-01 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: SIEMENS MEDICAL SOLUTIONS DIAGNOSTICS

2007-07-25 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2007-07-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2007-06-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2007-06-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2007-06-20 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070620

2007-06-20 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070620

2007-06-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BABAN, SOHEYL

2007-06-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BERNARD, MONIQUE

2007-06-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: CHERRY, ELANA

2007-06-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: GOSSELIN, DIANE

2007-06-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HUGO, PATRICE

2007-06-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MALETTE, BRIGITTE

2007-06-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MIRON, PIERRE

2007-06-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: PRIVE , CHARLES

2007-06-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SHAZAND, KAMRAN

2006-11-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041027

2006-03-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DIAGNOSTIC PRODUCTS CORPORATION

2004-12-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041026

2003-05-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: METRIOGENE BIOSCIENCES INC.

2003-04-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BABAN, SOHEYL

2003-04-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BERNARD, MONIQUE

2003-04-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: CHERRY, ELANA

2003-04-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: GOSSELIN, DIANE

2003-04-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HUGO, PATRICE

2003-04-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MALETTE, BRIGITTE

2003-04-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MIRON, PIERRE

2003-04-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: PRIV , CHARLES

2003-04-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SHAZAND, KAMRAN

2003-03-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020924

2003-03-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-03-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-03-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI