Global Patent Index - EP 1291469 A3

EP 1291469 A3 2003-06-04 - Device for introducing active substances into the flushing water, especially in toilet pans

Title (en)

Device for introducing active substances into the flushing water, especially in toilet pans

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Abgabe von Wirkstoffen in das Spülwasser, insbesondere in Toilettenbecken

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour la libération d'agents dans l'eau de rinçage, en particulier dans des cuvettes de toilettes

Publication

EP 1291469 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 02026378 A

Priority

  • DE 19900821 A
  • EP 99967944 A
  • US 58394800 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6389610B1] The invention concerns a device to dispense active substances into rinse water, especially in toilet bowls, with a container for the active substance, wherein the container has an opening that connects with an essentially plate-shaped distributor, and with a device to hold the distributor on or close to the toilet bowl wall. The distributor consists of two essentially plate-shaped elements. There are intersecting grooves, channels or the like between the plate-shaped elements, and a first group of grooves runs outward from the distributor while the other second group of grooves only runs within the distributor.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E03D 9/03

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E03D 9/02 (2006.01); B01J 4/00 (2006.01); E03D 9/03 (2006.01)

IPC 8 main group level (invention and additional information)

E03D (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E03D 9/032 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

No Search

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

US 6389610 B1 20020521; AT 236306 T 20030415; AU 2432100 A 20000801; AU 774557 B2 20040701; BR 9916880 A 20011030; CN 1157517 C 20040714; CN 1330742 A 20020109; DE 19912217 A1 20000713; DE 19912217 C2 20020905; DE 59904887 D1 20030508; DK 1141493 T3 20030721; EP 1141493 A1 20011010; EP 1141493 B1 20030402; EP 1291469 A2 20030312; EP 1291469 A3 20030604; ES 2196920 T3 20031216; ID 29929 A 20011025; JP 2002535514 A 20021022; NO 20013178 A 20010622; NO 20013178 D0 20010622; PL 196083 B1 20071231; PT 1141493 E 20030829; US 2003070213 A1 20030417; US 6591431 B2 20030715; WO 0042261 A1 20000720; ZA 200105659 B 20021010

INPADOC legal status


2004-10-13 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031205

2004-04-01 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-02-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-06-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HAUTMANN, HORST

2003-06-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SCHOENBECK, HEINZ-DIETER

2003-06-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WAGNER, KURT

2003-03-12 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 1141493 P

2003-03-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-03-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE