Global Patent Index - EP 1292657 B9

EP 1292657 B9 2009-02-25 - USE OF SOLID FUEL IN ENGINES, BOILERS AND OVENS

Title (en)

USE OF SOLID FUEL IN ENGINES, BOILERS AND OVENS

Title (de)

VERWENDUNG VON FESTBRENNSTOFF IN MOTOREN, KESSELN UND ÖFEN

Title (fr)

UTILISATION D'UN CARBURANT SOLIDE DANS DES MOTEURS, DES CHAUDIERES OU DES FOURS

Publication

EP 1292657 B9 (FR)

Application

EP 01947522 A

Priority

  • FR 0101905 W
  • FR 0007833 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2810335A1] The solid fuel comprises at least one compound from starch, lactose, cellulose and derivatives of these, and at least 15%, of the total constituents, of carbohydrates. It comprises a powder of which the mean and median diameters of the particles are greater or equal to 150 microns m, preferably 150-500 microns m. An Independent claim is also included for a combustible mixture comprising the above solid fuel and air.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C10L 5/44 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10L 5/44 (2013.01); Y02E 50/10 (2013.01); Y02E 50/30 (2013.01); Y02T 50/678 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

FR 2810335 A1 20011221; FR 2810335 B1 20060922; AT 402244 T 20080815; AU 2001269188 B2 20050922; AU 6918801 A 20020102; CN 1224682 C 20051026; CN 1441836 A 20030910; DE 60134978 D1 20080904; EP 1292657 A1 20030319; EP 1292657 B1 20080723; EP 1292657 B9 20090225; ES 2311017 T3 20090201; US 2003145515 A1 20030807; US 2007094923 A1 20070503; US 7201781 B2 20070410; US 7727292 B2 20100601; WO 0198438 A1 20011227

INPADOC legal status


2017-11-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20170630

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170724

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170713

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170721

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-10-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170809

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20170620

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170623

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-08-31 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20170620

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170626

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-07-31 [PGFP MC] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Payment date: 20170623

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-06-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-06-10 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-09-30 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080723

2011-08-31 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080723

2011-03-31 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: POURTOUT, GUILLAUME

- Free text: POURTOUT, GUILLAUME#86, AVENUE DE VILLIERS#75017 PARIS (FR) -TRANSFER TO- POURTOUT, GUILLAUME#86, AVENUE DE VILLIERS#75017 PARIS (FR)

2010-10-29 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20081024

2010-01-29 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20081023

2009-07-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20090424

2009-04-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080723

2009-04-30 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080723

2009-03-04 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2009-02-27 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080723

2009-02-27 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080723

2009-02-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2311017 T3

2009-01-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20081223

2008-09-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BOVARD AG PATENTANWAELTE

2008-09-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60134978 P 20080904

2008-09-03 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: FRENCH

2008-07-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2008-07-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2008-07-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2007-06-27 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: USE OF SOLID FUEL IN ENGINES, BOILERS AND OVENS

2006-03-29 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: USE OF SOLID FUEL IN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINES

2005-05-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050329

2003-03-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021223

2003-03-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-03-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-03-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI