Global Patent Index - EP 1293444 A3

EP 1293444 A3 2003-06-18 - Paperboard sleeve

Title (en)

Paperboard sleeve

Title (de)

Kartonhülse

Title (fr)

Manchon en carton

Publication

EP 1293444 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 02255866 A

Priority

GB 0121245 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1293444A2] There is provided a paperboard sleeve having a top, oppositely disposed side panels and a pair of base panels which interlock using suitable formations 24 to form an open ended sleeve. The sleeve provides a number of apertures 38 for receiving the heels of bottles retained by the sleeve. The end-most apertures 38 are each formed by a flap which is folded out to form the aperture. The flap has a first part 41 which remains attached to a central side panel 20 and a second part 42 which lies in the open end of the sleeve. An end panel 27 is then folded up about its hinge line 26 with the base and is glued to the two second parts 42, one at either side of the sleeve. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 71/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 71/00 (2006.01); B65D 71/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 71/20 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1293444 A2 20030319; EP 1293444 A3 20030618; GB 0121245 D0 20011024

INPADOC legal status


2004-09-22 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031219

2004-04-15 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-03-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-03-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-03-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-03-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI