Global Patent Index - EP 1293678 B1

EP 1293678 B1 2007-10-10 - Pump impeller with valve function

Title (en)

Pump impeller with valve function

Title (de)

Laufrad mit Ventilfunktion

Title (fr)

Rouet de pompe avec fonction de clapet anti-retour intégré

Publication

EP 1293678 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 02013218 A

Priority

DE 10145411 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1293678A2] The running wheel (6) of a rotary pump, mounted on a shaft, has a central suction opening as the entry port. When the running wheel is at rest, the leakage flow is blocked by a valve action through a sliding movement of the running wheel within the pump housing. The entry (20) and/or outflow (14) openings in the running wheel are blocked by the valve action. The inner wall has a cylindrical holder, to take the running wheel with an axial movement, and the wheel has an edge (13) which lies directly or indirectly at a sealing surface (18) of the holder when the wheel is pushed back.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04D 15/00 (2006.01); F04D 29/04 (2006.01); F04D 29/14 (2006.01); F04D 29/16 (2006.01); F04D 29/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04D 29/167 (2013.01); F04D 15/0038 (2013.01); F04D 29/042 (2013.01); F04D 29/146 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1293678 A2 20030319; EP 1293678 A3 20040107; EP 1293678 B1 20071010; DE 10145411 A1 20030403; DE 50211038 D1 20071129

INPADOC legal status


2016-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150630

2016-04-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150615

2016-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160101

2016-04-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160229

2016-02-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150615

2016-01-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150615

2016-01-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50211038

2014-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140609

- Year of fee payment: 13

2014-08-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140611

- Year of fee payment: 13

2014-08-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140612

- Year of fee payment: 13

2014-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140611

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-09-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080711

2008-01-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-11-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50211038 P 20071129

2007-11-21 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20071031

2007-10-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2007-10-10 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-08-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060714

2004-09-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-07-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040511

2004-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-01-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-01-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 04D 15/00 A

2004-01-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 04D 29/04 B

2004-01-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 04D 29/22 B

2003-03-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-03-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-03-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI