Global Patent Index - EP 1293842 B9

EP 1293842 B9 2007-10-03 - Method and apparatus for image forming capable of effectively justifying an image recording start position

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for image forming capable of effectively justifying an image recording start position

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Bilderzeugung mit verbesserter Justage der ersten Druckstelle einer Bildaufzeichnung

Title (fr)

Procédé et appareil de formation d'images pour justifier efficacement la position initiale d'impression d'enregistrement d'image

Publication

EP 1293842 B9 (EN)

Application

EP 02016202 A

Priority

JP 2001218993 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US2003030718A1] An image forming apparatus includes at least one image forming mechanism configured to form an image based on image data. Each image forming mechanism includes an optical system, a sensor, an electronic circuit, and a controller. The optical system scans a photosensitive member with a light beam based on image data. The sensor detects the light beam and the electronic circuit stores a correction data table containing light amount data of the light source and corresponding start position shift amount data. The controller controls a light amount of the light source and adjusts a start position of image recording on the photosensitive member in accordance with a sync detect signal. The controller includes a write start position correction unit that adjust the start position of the image recording based on a start position shift amount data when the light amount varies.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/44 (2006.01); G03G 15/01 (2006.01); G02B 26/10 (2006.01); G02B 26/12 (2006.01); G03G 15/043 (2006.01); G06K 15/12 (2006.01); H04N 1/053 (2006.01); H04N 1/113 (2006.01); H04N 1/23 (2006.01); H04N 1/50 (2006.01); H04N 1/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04N 1/506 (2013.01); G06K 15/1219 (2013.01); H04N 1/053 (2013.01); H04N 1/1135 (2013.01); H04N 1/12 (2013.01); H04N 2201/02439 (2013.01); H04N 2201/0471 (2013.01); H04N 2201/04732 (2013.01); H04N 2201/04744 (2013.01); H04N 2201/04784 (2013.01); H04N 2201/04786 (2013.01); H04N 2201/04794 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

US 2003030718 A1 20030213; US 6847390 B2 20050125; DE 60219859 D1 20070614; DE 60219859 T2 20080117; EP 1293842 A1 20030319; EP 1293842 B1 20070502; EP 1293842 B9 20071003; JP 2003029181 A 20030129; JP 4521800 B2 20100811

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170719

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170724

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170724

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-07-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-07-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2008-04-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080205

2007-09-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-06-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60219859 P 20070614

2007-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2007-05-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-12-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-06-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030411

2003-04-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: RICOH COMPANY LTD.

2003-03-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-03-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-03-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI