Global Patent Index - EP 1293969 A8

EP 1293969 A8 2003-06-25 - Magnetic recording medium

Title (en)

Magnetic recording medium

Title (de)

Magnetisches Aufzeichnungsmittel

Title (fr)

Moyen d' enregistrement magnétique

Publication

EP 1293969 A8 (EN)

Application

EP 02020514 A

Priority

  • JP 2001279403 A
  • JP 2001288946 A
  • JP 2001288947 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1293969A1] The present invention provides a magnetic recording medium, which comprises a chromium-containing primer layer and a magnetic layer at least on one surface of a nonmagnetic support member, said chromium-containing primer layer contains chromium and at least one type of element selected from a group of cobalt, beryllium, osmium, rhenium, titanium, zinc, tantalum, aluminum, molybdenum, tungsten, vanadium, iron, antimony, iridium, ruthenium, rhodium, platinum, palladium, silicon, and zirconium, and said magnetic layer comprises a ferromagnetic metal alloy containing at least cobalt, platinum and chromium, and a nonmagnetic material.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G11B 5/64

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G11B 5/64 (2006.01); G11B 5/73 (2006.01); G11B 5/851 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G11B 5/7325 (2013.01); G11B 5/656 (2013.01); G11B 5/7315 (2013.01); G11B 5/732 (2013.01); G11B 5/851 (2013.01); Y10T 428/24248 (2013.01); Y10T 428/24281 (2013.01); Y10T 428/256 (2013.01); Y10T 428/259 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1293969 A1 20030319; EP 1293969 A8 20030625; EP 1293969 B1 20060614; DE 60212281 D1 20060727; DE 60212281 T2 20070516; EP 1457972 A1 20040915; US 2003134151 A1 20030717; US 2004197606 A1 20041007; US 2005008901 A1 20050113

INPADOC legal status


2014-08-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130930

2014-08-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140401

2014-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130913

2014-06-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140530

2014-06-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60212281

- Effective date: 20140401

2014-05-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130913

2012-12-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120905

- Year of fee payment: 11

2012-12-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120926

- Year of fee payment: 11

2012-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120912

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-09-28 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2007-09-28 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2007-05-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070315

2007-05-02 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2007-03-14 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: FUJIFILM CORPORATION

2007-02-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-07-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60212281 P 20060727

2006-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2006-06-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-08-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: USUKI, KAZUYUKI

2004-08-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MORIWAKI, KENICHI

2004-08-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KATAYAMA, KAZUTOSHI

2004-08-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: NAGAO, MAKOTO

2004-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031107

2003-12-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-10-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030828

2003-06-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: USUKI, KAZUYUKI

2003-06-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MORIWAKI, KENICHI

2003-06-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KATAYAMA, KAZUTOSHI

2003-06-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: NAGAO, MAKOTO

2003-03-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-03-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-03-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI