EP 1294578 B1 20110608 - METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF COMPONENTS WITH A PRE-DETERMINED SURFACE APPEARANCE, IN PARTICULAR FOR FRONT PANELS OF KITCHEN UNITS
Title (en)
METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF COMPONENTS WITH A PRE-DETERMINED SURFACE APPEARANCE, IN PARTICULAR FOR FRONT PANELS OF KITCHEN UNITS
Title (de)
VERFAHREN, VORRICHTUNG UND SYSTEM ZUM HERSTELLEN VON BAUTEILEN MIT VORBESTIMMTEM OBERFLÄCHENAUSSEHEN, INSBESONDERE VON FRONTPLATTEN VON KÜCHENELEMENTEN
Title (fr)
PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE REALISER DES ELEMENTS STRUCTURELS AYANT UNE APPARENCE DE SURFACE PREDETERMINEE, NOTAMMENT DES PLAQUES FRONTALES D'ELEMENTS DE CUISINE
Publication
Application
Priority
- DE 10031030 A 20000626
- EP 0107159 W 20010625
Abstract (en)
[origin: EP2133154A2] The method involves printing the parts with a pre-determined pattern using a printing method that may be programmed according to the desired appearance. The surfaces to be printed may be wood or plastics. Three-dimensional surfaces may be printed. An inkjet process may be used, with different coloured inks sprayed from different nozzles. to produce a homogenous programmed colour. Independent claims are included for a device for implementing the method and a system for manufacturing groups of components.
IPC 8 full level
B44C 5/04 (2006.01); B05B 12/12 (2006.01); B05B 13/04 (2006.01); B41J 3/407 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP US)
B05B 12/122 (2013.01 - EP US); B05B 13/0447 (2013.01 - EP US); B05B 13/0468 (2013.01 - EP US); B05B 13/0473 (2013.01 - EP US); B05B 13/0478 (2013.01 - EP US); B27D 1/04 (2013.01 - EP); B41J 2/18 (2013.01 - EP US); B41J 3/4073 (2013.01 - EP US); B44C 5/04 (2013.01 - EP US); B44C 5/043 (2013.01 - EP US); B41M 5/0011 (2013.01 - EP US); B41M 5/0047 (2013.01 - EP US); B41M 5/0076 (2013.01 - EP US); B41M 7/0027 (2013.01 - EP US); B41M 7/02 (2013.01 - EP US)
Citation (examination)
- GB 2212761 A 19890802 - ROBERTS JOHN JOSEPH
- EP 0791480 A2 19970827 - FANCY PRODUCTS CO LTD [JP]
- DE 3107798 A1 19820916 - WF RATIONAL ANBAUKUECHEN GMBH [DE]
- GB 395014 A 19330704 - MASA GES MIT BESCHRAENKTER HAF
- GB 319006 A 19301016 - MASA GES MIT BESCHRAENKTER HAF
- DE 19532724 A1 19970306 - TAMPOPRINT GMBH [DE]
- DE 19513735 A1 19961017 - KAHRMANN GMBH [DE]
- DE 4442968 A1 19950614 - PREMDOR INC [CA]
- DE 3431484 A1 19850314 - CANON KK [JP]
- NEW DECOR, February 2007 (2007-02-01)
- SALZBURGER FENSTER, 9 October 2008 (2008-10-09)
- ALNO DIE WELT DER KÜCHE, 20 February 2009 (2009-02-20)
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR
DOCDB simple family (publication)
WO 0200449 A1 20020103; AT E512004 T1 20110615; AU 7846601 A 20020108; CN 1176815 C 20041124; CN 1438942 A 20030827; DE 10031030 A1 20020117; DE 10031030 B4 20050804; DK 1294578 T3 20110926; EP 1294578 A1 20030326; EP 1294578 B1 20110608; EP 1294578 B2 20181017; EP 1294578 B9 20190515; EP 2133154 A2 20091216; EP 2133154 A3 20111207; EP 2133154 B1 20131030; ES 2364625 T3 20110908; ES 2364625 T5 20190611; ES 2444423 T3 20140225; PT 1294578 E 20110803; PT 2133154 E 20131205; US 2004028830 A1 20040212; US 7357959 B2 20080415
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 0107159 W 20010625; AT 01956502 T 20010625; AU 7846601 A 20010625; CN 01811747 A 20010625; DE 10031030 A 20000626; DK 01956502 T 20010625; EP 01956502 A 20010625; EP 09165481 A 20010625; ES 01956502 T 20010625; ES 09165481 T 20010625; PT 01956502 T 20010625; PT 09165481 T 20010625; US 31260102 A 20021223