Global Patent Index - EP 1294982 B1

EP 1294982 B1 2007-10-03 - METHOD FOR MAKING TISSUE PAPER

Title (en)

METHOD FOR MAKING TISSUE PAPER

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON TISSUEPAPIER

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE PAPIER TISSU

Publication

EP 1294982 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 01946608 A

Priority

  • US 0119807 W
  • US 60771100 A
  • US 60771200 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0202869A2] A tissue sheet is made using a modified wet pressing machine in a modified wet pressing process employing an integrally sealed air press. After initial formation and conventional vacuum dewatering, the wet web is conformed to the surface contour of a relatively coarse fabric to give the web a textured surface. By creating a pressure differential across the web of at least 30 inches of mercury and an air stream through the web of at least 500 SCFM/in<2>, the air press noncompressively dewaters the wet web to a consistency of about 30 to about 40 percent prior to a heated drying cylinder. The web is dried to substantially preserve its three-dimensional, throughdried-like texture. The process provides a web having an exceptionally high degree of bulk and absorbency not expected in wet-pressed products.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21F 11/14 (2006.01); D21F 1/48 (2006.01); D21F 1/52 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21F 11/145 (2013.01); D21F 1/48 (2013.01); D21F 1/52 (2013.01); D21F 11/14 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0202869 A2 20020110; WO 0202869 A3 20020516; AT 374862 T 20071015; AU 2001268634 B2 20050428; AU 6863401 A 20020114; BR 0112114 A 20030930; BR 0112114 B1 20130402; CA 2415937 A1 20020110; CA 2415937 C 20090519; CN 1440480 A 20030903; CO 5650179 A2 20060630; DE 60130761 D1 20071115; DE 60130761 T2 20080717; EP 1294982 A2 20030326; EP 1294982 B1 20071003; KR 100822568 B1 20080416; KR 20030034111 A 20030501; MX PA02012362 A 20050419

INPADOC legal status


2014-05-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130621

2014-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130621

2014-02-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130621

2012-09-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100622

2012-09-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120622

- Year of fee payment: 12

2012-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120625

- Year of fee payment: 12

2012-05-10 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60130761

- Effective date: 20120103

2012-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120103

2012-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110630

2012-03-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120229

2011-02-01 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2010-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100629

- Year of fee payment: 10

2010-07-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100630

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20090629

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-09-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080704

2008-07-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2008-06-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071003

2007-11-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60130761 P 20071115

2007-11-06 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2007-10-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT SE

2007-10-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2007-05-16 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT SE

2004-05-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK FR GB IT LI SE

2003-03-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030107

2003-03-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-03-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-03-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI