Global Patent Index - EP 1298303 A3

EP 1298303 A3 2004-12-01 - Method and control and/or regulation device for operating an internal combustion engine, and internal combustion engine

Title (en)

Method and control and/or regulation device for operating an internal combustion engine, and internal combustion engine

Title (de)

Verfahren und Steuer- und/oder Regelgerät zum Betreiben einer Brennkraftmaschine, sowie Brennkraftmaschine

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif de commande et/ou de réglage du fonctionnement d'un moteur à combustion interne, ainsi que moteur à combustion interne

Publication

EP 1298303 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 02018418 A

Priority

DE 10147815 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1298303A2] The operating method has the fuel mass (ms) injected into the engine combustion chambers by the fuel injectors (22) during the starting of the engine regulated in dependence on the pressure in the common-rail, supplied with fuel by at least one fuel pump. <??>Also included are Independent claims for the following: <??>(a) a computer program for an operating method for a direct fuel injection diesel engine; <??>(b) a control and regulation device for operating a direct fuel injection diesel engine; <??>(c) a direct fuel injection diesel engine

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02D 41/06; F02D 41/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02N 19/00 (2010.01); F02D 41/02 (2006.01); F02D 41/06 (2006.01); F02D 41/38 (2006.01); F02D 45/00 (2006.01); F02M 37/06 (2006.01); F02M 37/08 (2006.01); F02M 51/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/3836 (2013.01); F02D 41/062 (2013.01); F02D 2200/0602 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1298303 A2 20030402; EP 1298303 A3 20041201; EP 1298303 B1 20070411; DE 10147815 A1 20030424; DE 50209905 D1 20070524; JP 2003155946 A 20030530

INPADOC legal status


2015-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150303

2015-05-28 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50209905

- Effective date: 20150303

2015-03-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50209905

2014-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20131025

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-07-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100831

2011-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100816

2011-05-20 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110502

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090824

- Year of fee payment: 8

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090819

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-03-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080114

2007-09-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-07-22 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070722

2007-05-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50209905 P 20070524

2007-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

2005-08-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

2005-08-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20050601

2004-12-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2004-12-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-04-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-04-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-04-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI