Global Patent Index - EP 1298620 A3

EP 1298620 A3 2003-06-18 - Controlsystem for lightsignal devices at intersections

Title (en)

Controlsystem for lightsignal devices at intersections

Title (de)

System zum Steuern von Lichtsignalgebern an Kreuzungen

Title (fr)

Système de commande pour dispositif lumineux de signalisation d'un carrefour

Publication

EP 1298620 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 02020174 A

Priority

DE 10146398 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1298620A2] The control method uses cyclic determination of the traffic parameters at the road intersection, with a control device (10) used for determination of corresponding traffic conditions and selection of a corresponding light signal control program, for supplying each light signal source (40) with switching commands. <??>An Independent claim for a control device for road intersection traffic light signals is also included.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08G 1/095

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G08G 1/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08G 1/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1298620 A2 20030402; EP 1298620 A3 20030618; EP 1298620 B1 20070718; DE 10146398 A1 20030417; DE 50210488 D1 20070830; US 2003063016 A1 20030403; US 6850171 B2 20050201

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090909

2010-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090909

2010-10-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090930

2010-10-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090930

2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100401

2010-07-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100401

2010-05-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090909

2010-04-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2010-04-21 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100401

2009-03-31 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG;INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY FREILAGERSTRASSE 40;8047 ZUERICH (CH)

2009-01-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20081211

- Year of fee payment: 7

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081121

- Year of fee payment: 7

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080911

- Year of fee payment: 7

2008-11-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080924

- Year of fee payment: 7

2008-11-28 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20080910

- Year of fee payment: 7

2008-06-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080421

2007-08-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50210488 P 20070830

2007-08-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2007-08-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG

2007-08-08 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20070718

2007-07-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE GB IT LI NL

2007-07-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-08-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041103

2004-12-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041103

2004-03-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): CH DE GB IT LI NL

2003-09-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030721

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-04-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-04-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-04-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI