Global Patent Index - EP 1298687 A3

EP 1298687 A3 2004-12-15 - Arc extinguisher for low voltage switchgear

Title (en)

Arc extinguisher for low voltage switchgear

Title (de)

Lichtbogenlöscheinrichtung für Niederspannungs-Schaltgeräte

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'extinction d'arc pour appareils de coupure à basse tension

Publication

EP 1298687 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 02090180 A

Priority

DE 10149019 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1298687A2] The device has a quenching chamber with a quenching plate and a cover (8) with outlet openings (9) for switching gases and a selectively usable, separate cooling device (10) for the cooling gases with a de-ionization arrangement. The separate cooling device is frame-shaped to accommodate the de-ionization arrangement and is suitable for installation inside the quenching device between the quenching plate and the cover.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 9/34; H01H 9/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 9/34 (2006.01); H01H 9/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 9/342 (2013.01); H01H 9/362 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1298687 A2 20030402; EP 1298687 A3 20041215; EP 1298687 B1 20071107; DE 10149019 C1 20030618; DE 50211159 D1 20071220; US 2003062341 A1 20030403; US 6784393 B2 20040831

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170531

2018-03-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20180131

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170721

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160512

- Year of fee payment: 15

2016-05-12 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090523

2010-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090523

2010-01-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090523

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080519

- Year of fee payment: 7

2008-11-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080528

- Year of fee payment: 7

2008-10-15 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080808

2008-04-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-12-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50211159 P 20071220

2007-12-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20071121

2007-11-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2007-11-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-09-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2005-03-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20050110

2004-12-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-12-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-04-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-04-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-04-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI