Global Patent Index - EP 1300293 A9

EP 1300293 A9 2003-06-25 - Bumper assembly of a motor vehicle for pedestrian protection

Title (en)

Bumper assembly of a motor vehicle for pedestrian protection

Title (de)

Stossstangenanordnung eines Kraftfahrzeuges zum Schutz von Fussgängern

Title (fr)

Ensemble de pare-chocs d'un véhicule pour la protection des piétons

Publication

EP 1300293 A9 (EN)

Application

EP 01123401 A

Priority

EP 01123401 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1300293A1] The bumper includes an under tray that is made from laminate with stiffening ribs and grooves (9). The tray is supported from the rear independently of the bumper mounts ideally from the radiator (8) or engine or chassis. Collapsible tube mounted along the front of the tray is located in the lower edge of the rear of the bumper fascia (5). Alternatively collapse may be provided by bump stops between tray and fascia or by a weak fold line in the tray.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B60R 19/12; B60R 19/56

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60R 19/12 (2006.01); B60R 21/34 (2011.01); B62D 35/02 (2006.01); B60R 13/08 (2006.01); B60R 19/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B60R 19/12 (2013.01); B60R 21/34 (2013.01); B62D 35/02 (2013.01); B60R 13/0861 (2013.01); B60R 2019/1886 (2013.01); Y02T 10/88 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1300293 A1 20030409; EP 1300293 A9 20030625; EP 1300293 B1 20041201; DE 60107570 D1 20050105; DE 60107570 T2 20051215

INPADOC legal status


2013-08-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121001

2013-08-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60107570

- Effective date: 20130403

2013-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130403

2013-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120928

2013-06-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130531

2013-05-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120928

2011-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110901

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110826

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100930

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-12-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-11-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050902

2005-01-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60107570 P 20050105

2004-12-22 [REG GB ERR] ERRATUM

- Free text: THE ABOVE EP(UK) PATENT WAS ADVERTISED IN THE PATENTS AND DESIGNS JOURNAL NO. 6028 DATED 20041201 AS GERMAN. NOTIFICATION RECEIVED FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT OFFICE THAT THE PUBLICATION LANGUAGE IS ACTUALLY ENGLISH.

2004-12-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-12-01 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-05-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 60R 19/12 A

2004-05-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 60R 19/56 B

2004-05-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 60R 21/34 B

2004-05-06 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: MOTOR VEHICLE WITH BUMPER ASSEMBLY FOR PEDESTRIAN PROTECTION

2004-04-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: FORD GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES, LLC

2004-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-10-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030819

2003-06-25 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: BUMPER ASSEMBLY OF A MOTOR VEHICLE FOR PEDESTRIAN PROTECTION

2003-04-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020903

2003-04-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-04-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-04-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI