Global Patent Index - EP 1301665 B1

EP 1301665 B1 2009-02-11 - PUMP STATION

Title (en)

PUMP STATION

Title (de)

PUMPSTATION

Title (fr)

POSTE DE POMPAGE

Publication

EP 1301665 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 01969360 A

Priority

  • DE 10034174 A
  • EP 0107923 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0206596A1] The invention relates to a pump station, comprising a building that includes at least one inlet chamber, and at least one outlet chamber that is disposed on a different level. A partition is provided between said at least two chamber within the building. At least one pump delivers a fluid through such a partition into an outlet chamber of the building. Said outlet chamber comprises an outlet opening arranged at an angle to a discharge opening. The upper edge of said discharge opening is below the liquid level that is present in an outlet provided downstream of the building. An ascending device that carries liquid and that is provided with a discharge opening that is open at the top is mounted downstream of the pump. Said discharge opening is disposed in the outlet chamber above the upper edge of the outlet opening.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E03F 5/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E03F 5/22 (2013.01); Y10T 137/86035 (2015.04); Y10T 137/86083 (2015.04); Y10T 137/86163 (2015.04); Y10T 137/86204 (2015.04); Y10T 137/86212 (2015.04); Y10T 137/86228 (2015.04)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0206596 A1 20020124; AR 031378 A1 20030924; AT 422584 T 20090215; AU 8963701 A 20020130; BR 0112567 A 20030729; BR 0112567 B1 20101130; CZ 20030058 A3 20030618; DE 10034174 A1 20020124; DE 50114702 D1 20090326; DK 1301665 T3 20090608; EP 1301665 A1 20030416; EP 1301665 B1 20090211; ES 2322238 T3 20090618; HU 0400523 A2 20040628; HU 227734 B1 20120130; MX PA03000396 A 20030527; PL 204069 B1 20091231; PL 365707 A1 20050110; PT 1301665 E 20090514; RO 121342 B1 20070330; US 2003152470 A1 20030814; US 6681801 B2 20040127; ZA 200210199 B 20031222

INPADOC legal status


2014-02-28 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120710

2013-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120711

2013-10-21 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20131021

2013-09-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50114702

- Effective date: 20130201

2013-07-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120731

2013-07-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120710

2013-05-31 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130204

2013-05-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130110

2013-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120731

2013-05-08 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2013-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120710

2013-04-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130201

2013-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120731

2013-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130201

2013-04-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130329

2013-04-02 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

2013-03-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120710

2013-03-01 [REG GR ML] LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Document: GR 20090401237

- Effective date: 20130104

2013-02-13 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130201

2013-01-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: KSB A.G.

- Effective date: 20120731

2013-01-17 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20130110

2011-12-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20110801

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-12-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20110726

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-11-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20110713

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110705

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-11-30 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20110728

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-11-30 [PGFP TR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Payment date: 20110711

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110719

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110729

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-10-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20110721

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-10-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20110709

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-09-30 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090211

2011-07-29 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20110627

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-04-29 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090710

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090211

2010-11-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090710

2010-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090731

2010-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090731

2010-02-26 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090731

2010-02-26 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2010-01-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20091112

2009-08-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090511

2009-07-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090211

2009-06-18 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2322238 T3

2009-06-12 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20090401237

2009-06-08 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2009-05-14 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20090507

2009-03-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50114702 P 20090326

2009-03-04 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2009-02-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2009-02-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2007-09-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070801

2003-06-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: HOEHN, WOLFGANG

2003-06-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KNOEPFEL, HANS-DIETER

2003-06-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MEYER, GERHARD

2003-06-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: ROESLER, WOLFGANG

2003-06-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: ROSENBERGER, HARTMUT

2003-06-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: HOEHN, WOLFGANG

2003-06-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KNOEPFEL, HANS-DIETER

2003-06-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MEYER, GERHARD

2003-06-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: ROESLER, WOLFGANG

2003-06-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: ROSENBERGER, HARTMUT

2003-05-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: HOEHN, WOLFGANG

2003-05-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KNOEPFEL, HANS-DIETER

2003-05-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MEYER, GERHARD

2003-05-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: ROESLER, WOLFGANG

2003-05-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: ROSENBERGER, HARTMUT

2003-04-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021212

2003-04-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-04-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: LT LV MK RO SI