Global Patent Index - EP 1301705 B1

EP 1301705 B1 2007-10-03 - METHOD FOR STARTING A MULTI-CYLINDER INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE

Title (en)

METHOD FOR STARTING A MULTI-CYLINDER INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM STARTEN EINER MEHRZYLINDRIGEN BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE

Title (fr)

PROCEDE POUR DEMARRER UN MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE A PLUSIEURS CYLINDRES

Publication

EP 1301705 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 01913583 A

Priority

  • DE 0100467 W
  • DE 10020325 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0181759A1] The invention relates to a method for starting a multi-cylinder internal combustion engine (1), especially of a motor vehicle in a forward direction, whereby the position of a piston (2) in a cylinder (3) of the internal combustion engine (1) is determined and fuel is injected into a combustion chamber (4) of the cylinder (3) whose piston (2) is located in a working phase. In order to be able to reliably start the internal combustion engine before the starting process (14), without the use of an electric starter and irrespective of the position of the pistons (2) in the cylinders (3), the invention provides that the internal combustion engine (1) is firstly moved in a reverse direction by injecting fuel into a combustion chamber (4) of at least one cylinder (3) whose piston, when viewed in a forward direction, is located in a compression phase, and the fuel compressed in the combustion chamber (4) of the at least one cylinder (3) is ignited, whereby the rotating motion in the reverse direction is stopped before reaching the lower dead center (UT) of the piston (2) of the at least one cylinder (3), and the internal combustion engine is then started in a forward direction.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02N 9/02 (2006.01); F02D 13/02 (2006.01); F02D 41/02 (2006.01); F02D 41/06 (2006.01); F02D 45/00 (2006.01); F02M 59/40 (2006.01); F02M 59/42 (2006.01); F02N 11/08 (2006.01); F02N 19/00 (2010.01); F02N 99/00 (2010.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02N 99/006 (2013.01); F02N 9/02 (2013.01); F02N 19/005 (2013.01); F02N 2019/007 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0181759 A1 20011101; AU 3915801 A 20011107; DE 10020325 A1 20011108; DE 50113088 D1 20071115; EP 1301705 A1 20030416; EP 1301705 B1 20071003; JP 2003532005 A 20031028; JP 4456792 B2 20100428; US 2003101956 A1 20030605; US 6799547 B2 20041005

INPADOC legal status


2016-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150901

2015-09-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50113088

2014-08-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140417

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110228

2011-11-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20111102

2010-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100315

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-09-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080704

2008-06-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-11-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50113088 P 20071115

2007-10-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR

2004-05-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR

2003-04-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021126

2003-04-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-04-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI