Global Patent Index - EP 1304412 A3

EP 1304412 A3 2003-06-25 - Process for bleaching lignocellulosic pulp

Title (en)

Process for bleaching lignocellulosic pulp

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Bleichen von lignocellulosischem Zellstoff

Title (fr)

Procédé de blanchiment de pate lignocellulosique

Publication

EP 1304412 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 02028861 A

Priority

  • EP 00302354 A
  • JP 7754999 A
  • JP 22906899 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1039020A1] Lignocellulose pulp is bleached by bleaching a pulp in aqueous alkali solution with oxygen and treating the pulp with an enzyme, while a liquid fraction delivered from the enzyme treatment step is subjected to a penetration treatment through a separation membrane, for example, reverse osmosis membrane, to separate a permeated fraction from a non-permeated fraction; the permeated fraction is fed to the alkali-oxygen bleaching (oxygen delignification) step and is used as a liquid medium of the bleaching system; and non-permeated fraction is subjected to a xylooligosaccharide-collecting procedure. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B01D 61/00; B01D 61/02; B01D 61/14; B01D 63/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21C 5/00 (2006.01); D21C 9/147 (2006.01); D21C 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21C 5/005 (2013.01); D21C 9/147 (2013.01); D21C 11/0042 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] WO 9815581 A1 19980416 - CYTEL CORP [US], et al
  • [A] US 4908311 A 19900313 - SASAKI TAKASHI [JP], et al
  • [A] EP 0301522 A2 19890201 - SHOWA DENKO KK [JP]
  • [A] WO 9102840 A1 19910307 - CULTOR OY [FI]
  • [A] DATABASE WPI 26 November 1990 Derwent World Patents Index; AN 1991-012408, XP002239390
  • [A] PAICE M G ET AL: "Viscosity-enhancing bleaching of harwood kraft pulp with xylanase from a clone gene", BIOTECHNOLOGY AND BIOENGINEERING. INCLUDING: SYMPOSIUM BIOTECHNOLOGY IN ENERGY PRODUCTION AND CONSERVATION, JOHN WILEY & SONS. NEW YORK, US, VOL. 32, PAGE(S) 235-239, ISSN: 0006-3592, XP002084960
  • [A] VIIKARI L ET AL: "BLEACHING WITH ENZYMES", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON BIOTECHNOLOGY IN THE PULP AND PAPER INDUSTRY: ADVANCES IN APPLIED AND FUNDAMENTALS RESEARCH, XX, XX, PAGE(S) 67-69, XP000916065

Designated contracting state (EPC)

FI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1039020 A1 20000927; EP 1039020 B1 20040218; CA 2301371 A1 20000923; CA 2301371 C 20090901; CA 2627846 A1 20000923; CA 2627846 C 20110104; EP 1304412 A2 20030423; EP 1304412 A3 20030625; EP 1304412 B1 20050914

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160323

2016-11-01 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2016-10-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160322

2015-05-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20150319

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-04-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20150311

- Year of fee payment: 16

2006-08-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060615

2006-01-10 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2005-09-14 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 1039020 P

2005-09-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): FI SE

2005-09-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: IZUMI, YOSHIYA

2005-09-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SUGIURA, JUN

2005-09-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KAGAWA, HITOSHI

2005-09-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: AZUMI, NAOYA

2005-08-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: OJI PAPER CO., LTD.

2005-04-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 01D 61/00 A

2005-04-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 01D 61/02 B

2005-04-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 01D 61/14 B

2005-04-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 01D 63/00 B

2005-04-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7D 21C 11/00 B

2005-04-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7D 21C 5/00 B

2005-03-16 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: PROCESS FOR PRODUCING XYLOOLIGOSACCHARIDES

2004-03-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): FI SE

2003-11-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030926

2003-07-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: IZUMI, YOSHIYA

2003-07-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SUGIURA, JUN

2003-07-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KAGAWA, HITOSHI

2003-07-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: AZUMI, NAOYA

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): FI SE

2003-06-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 01D 61/00 A

2003-06-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 01D 61/02 B

2003-06-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 01D 61/14 B

2003-06-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 01D 63/00 B

2003-04-23 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 1039020 P

2003-04-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): FI SE