Global Patent Index - EP 1306461 A4

EP 1306461 A4 2007-10-10 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING HALF-FINISHED PRODUCTS MADE OF ALUMINIUM ALLOYS AND AN ARTICLE MANUFACTURED WITH THE AID OF SAID METHOD

Title (en)

METHOD FOR PRODUCING HALF-FINISHED PRODUCTS MADE OF ALUMINIUM ALLOYS AND AN ARTICLE MANUFACTURED WITH THE AID OF SAID METHOD

Title (de)

HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR HALBFERTIGE PRODUKTE AUS ALUMINIUMLEGIERUNGEN UND EIN UNTER ZUHILFENAHME DIESES VERFAHRENS HERGESTELLTER ARTIKEL

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UN DEMI-PRODUIT A PARTIR D'UN ALLIAGE D'ALUMINIUM ET ARTICLE OBTENU PAR CE PROCEDE

Publication

EP 1306461 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 01957048 A

Priority

  • RU 0100319 W
  • RU 2000120275 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0210482A2] The invention relates to a method for producing shaped half-finished products and articles made of high-strength aluminium alloys in the form of ribs, fittings, beams etc. used for the aircraft and space engineering and for vehicle building. The inventive method consists in the following operations: ingot casting, homogenisation and forging thereof; compressing a forged billet, hardening and cold shaping thereof in two stages: 1) stretch flattering with a residual deformation ranging from 1 % to 5 %; 2) three-dimensional bending of the billet simultaneously with local plastic deformation by compression ranging from 1 % to 20 % in coupling zones of elements of the billet which are arranged at an angle ranging from 45 DEG to 135 DEG in relation to each other. Ageing is carried out in two steps: in the first step, the billet is heated to a temperature ranging between 90 DEG C and 120 DEG C during 5-24 hours, in the second step the billet is heated to a temperature ranging between 160 DEG C and 190 DEG C during 5-20 hours. The inventive method makes it possible to produce long half-finished products having an irregular shape and made of deformable aluminium alloys having high strength characteristics and crack resistance and a low level of residual deformations thereby ensuring the production of articles devoid of shrinkage and buckling during mechanical operations.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C22F 1/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C22F 1/04 (2006.01); C22F 1/053 (2006.01)

IPC 8 main group level (invention and additional information)

C25D (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C22F 1/053 (2013.01); C22F 1/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0210482 A2 20020207; WO 0210482 A3 20020926; CA 2417998 A1 20030203; CA 2417998 C 20090421; DE 60135853 D1 20081030; EP 1306461 A2 20030502; EP 1306461 A4 20071010; EP 1306461 B1 20080917; RU 2184174 C2 20020627; US 2005028899 A1 20050210

INPADOC legal status


2016-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150731

2016-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160202

2016-04-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160331

2016-02-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60135853

2014-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140708

- Year of fee payment: 14

2014-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140724

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-08-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20090618

2008-10-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60135853 P 20081030

2008-09-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR

2008-05-14 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR

2008-04-16 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: METHOD FOR PRODUCING HALF-FINISHED PRODUCTS MADE OF ALUMINIUM ALLOYS

2007-12-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20071031

2007-10-10 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20070906

2004-10-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FEDERALNOE GOSUDARSTVENNOE UNITARNOE PREDPRIYATIE

2004-10-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: JOINT-STOCK COMPANY "SAMARA METALLURGICAL PLANT"

2004-05-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE FR

2003-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030124

2003-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR