Global Patent Index - EP 1307320 A4

EP 1307320 A4 2004-12-01 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR CHEMICAL MECHANICAL POLISHING OF SUBSTRATES

Title (en)

APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR CHEMICAL MECHANICAL POLISHING OF SUBSTRATES

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM CHEMISCH-MECHANISCHEN POLIEREN VON SUBSTRATEN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE DE POLISSAGE MECANO-CHIMIQUE DE SUBSTRATS

Publication

EP 1307320 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 01962336 A

Priority

  • US 0141513 W
  • US 62856300 A
  • US 25901600 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0209906A1] A chemical mechanical polishing system having a wafer carrier assembly is provided. The wafer carrier assembly includes a wafer carrier support frame, (52) a wafer carrier head housing (56) rotatably mounted on the wafer carrier support frame, with a wafer carrier base including a bladder bellows (98) operatively connecting the wafer carrier base to the wafer carrier head housing. A retaining ring (96) is also provided, connected to a retaining ring bearing (142) that allows relative axial motion while constraining relative radial motion between the retaining ring and wafer carrier head housing, and a retaining ring bellows (144) to urge the retaining ring against a polishing member. A chamber formed by the bladder bellows, wafer carrier base and wafer carrier housing may be pressurized to load the wafer carrier base, and wafer, against a polishing member, independent of any frictional loads on the retaining ring.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B24B 1/00; B24B 5/00; B24B 37/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B24B 37/32 (2012.01); H01L 21/304 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B24B 37/32 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 0209906 A1 20020207; AU 8352901 A 20020213; CN 1460042 A 20031203; DE 60127269 D1 20070426; EP 1307320 A1 20030507; EP 1307320 A4 20041201; EP 1307320 B1 20070314; JP 2004505456 A 20040219; TW 577785 B 20040301; US 2002137448 A1 20020926; US 7029381 B2 20060418

INPADOC legal status


2008-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070314

2008-05-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070731

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071102

2008-04-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070314

2008-03-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070731

2008-02-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20071217

2008-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070615

2007-11-09 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2007-11-02 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2007-09-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2007-06-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: ASML US, INC. EN MASSACHUSETTS INSTITUTE OF TECHNO

- Effective date: 20070404

2007-04-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60127269 P 20070426

2007-04-04 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: ASML US, INC.

2007-04-04 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: MASSACHUSETTS INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY

2007-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2007-03-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2007-03-14 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070314

2006-10-25 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2005-04-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050311

2004-12-01 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20041014

2004-11-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 24B 1/00 A

2004-11-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 24B 5/00 B

2004-11-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 24B 37/04 B

2004-05-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE FR GB IT LI NL

2003-05-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030227

2003-05-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-05-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI