Global Patent Index - EP 1308074 B1

EP 1308074 B1 2009-02-25 - METHOD FOR THE OPERATION OF A COMPONENT PLACEMENT UNIT, COMPONENT PLACEMENT UNIT FOR CARRYING OUT SAID METHOD AND FEED DEVICE FOR SAID COMPONENT PLACEMENT UNIT

Title (en)

METHOD FOR THE OPERATION OF A COMPONENT PLACEMENT UNIT, COMPONENT PLACEMENT UNIT FOR CARRYING OUT SAID METHOD AND FEED DEVICE FOR SAID COMPONENT PLACEMENT UNIT

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM BETREIBEN EINER BESTÜCKANLAGE, BESTÜCKANLAGE ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG DES VERFAHRENS UND ÜBERGABEEINRICHTUNG FÜR DIE BESTÜCKANLAGE

Title (fr)

PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE FAIRE FONCTIONNER UNE INSTALLATION D'IMPLANTATION DE COMPOSANTS, INSTALLATION D'IMPLANTATION DE COMPOSANTS PERMETTANT LA MISE EN OEUVRE DU PROCEDE, ET DISPOSITIF DE TRANSFERT DESTINE A L'INSTALLATION D'IMPLANTATION DE COMPOSANTS

Publication

EP 1308074 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 01957748 A

Priority

  • DE 0102934 W
  • DE 10039201 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0213589A1] The invention relates to a method for the operation of a component placement unit, a component placement unit for carrying out said method and a feed device for said component placement unit, permitting an optimised flexible operation of component placement units, whereby the main transport direction (HT) of the transport runs (130, 140) is reversed and component supports (110, 120, 120-R) are transported in the opposite direction (GT).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H05K 13/00 (2006.01); H05K 13/02 (2006.01); H05K 13/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05K 13/0061 (2013.01); Y10T 29/4913 (2013.01); Y10T 29/53091 (2013.01); Y10T 29/53174 (2013.01); Y10T 29/53187 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 0213589 A1 20020214; CN 1225957 C 20051102; CN 1436441 A 20030813; DE 10039201 A1 20020228; DE 50114729 D1 20090409; EP 1308074 A1 20030507; EP 1308074 B1 20090225; JP 2004506319 A 20040226; KR 20030018075 A 20030304; US 2004117983 A1 20040624

INPADOC legal status


2016-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160301

2016-03-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50114729

2014-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140821

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110831

2012-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110802

2012-05-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120430

2012-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110831

2012-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110831

2012-04-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110802

2012-03-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090225

2011-02-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20101109

- Year of fee payment: 10

2010-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100812

- Year of fee payment: 10

2010-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100901

- Year of fee payment: 10

2010-02-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20091126

2009-08-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2009-07-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090225

2009-06-02 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: SIEMENS ELECTRONICS ASSEMBLY SYSTEMS GMBH & CO. KG

- Effective date: 20090415

2009-04-15 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: SIEMENS ELECTRONICS ASSEMBLY SYSTEMS GMBH & CO. KG

2009-04-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50114729 P 20090409

2009-03-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG

2009-02-27 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2009-02-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-11-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030825

2004-05-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2003-10-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030825

2003-05-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030204

2003-05-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR