Global Patent Index - EP 1308587 A3

EP 1308587 A3 2004-12-08 - Electronic lock for cabinets or vending machines

Title (en)

Electronic lock for cabinets or vending machines

Title (de)

Elektronischer Schrank- oder Automatverschluss

Title (fr)

Serrure électronique pour armoire ou machine de vente

Publication

EP 1308587 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 02024024 A

Priority

DE 20117800 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1308587A2] The lock bolt (5) has a toothed section (6) driven by a gear (7) and motor (8) when the electronic control unit is activated by a signal transmitted by a remote key transponder (20) and the motor is operated to drive the bolt between two limit switches (11).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 49/00; E05B 47/00; E05B 47/02; E05B 47/06; E05B 65/44; E05B 65/46; E05C 9/02; G07C 9/00; G07F 5/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07F 5/26 (2006.01); G07F 9/00 (2006.01); E05B 47/00 (2006.01); E05B 47/06 (2006.01); E05B 65/46 (2006.01); E05C 9/02 (2006.01); E05C 9/08 (2006.01); G07C 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 47/0603 (2013.01); E05B 47/0012 (2013.01); E05C 9/026 (2013.01); G07F 5/26 (2013.01); G07F 9/00 (2013.01); E05B 65/468 (2013.01); E05B 2047/002 (2013.01); E05B 2047/0069 (2013.01); E05C 9/021 (2013.01); E05C 9/08 (2013.01); G07C 2009/00793 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

EPO simple patent family

DE 20117800 U1 20030320; EP 1308587 A2 20030507; EP 1308587 A3 20041208

INPADOC legal status


2006-03-08 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050609

2005-10-06 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2005-08-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2004-12-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2004-12-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-12-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 05B 49/00 A

2004-12-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 05B 47/02 B

2004-12-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 07C 9/00 B

2004-12-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 05B 47/00 B

2004-12-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 05B 47/06 B

2004-12-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 05C 9/02 B

2004-12-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 05B 65/44 B

2004-12-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 05B 65/46 B

2004-12-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 07F 5/26 B

2003-05-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-05-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI