Global Patent Index - EP 1308618 B1

EP 1308618 B1 2004-12-29 - Fuel injection valve

Title (en)

Fuel injection valve

Title (de)

Brennstoffeinspritzventil

Title (fr)

Soupape d'injection de carburant

Publication

EP 1308618 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 02022008 A

Priority

DE 10153627 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1308618A1] The fuel injection valve has a solenoid-operated valve needle (3) with a shut-off component (4) formed at the injection end. A swirl element (34) reaches through the valve shut-off component and is installed on the inlet side face (39) of the valve seat (5). The valve needle and/or shut-off component has a taper (37) in the region of the swirl element and reduces the radial extent of the valve needle. The taper extends in the axial direction at least between the sealing seat and inlet side end face (38) of the swirl element.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 61/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 51/06 (2006.01); F02M 51/08 (2006.01); F02M 61/10 (2006.01); F02M 61/16 (2006.01); F02M 61/18 (2006.01); F02M 61/12 (2006.01); F02M 63/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 61/162 (2013.01); F02M 51/0671 (2013.01); F02M 61/12 (2013.01); F02M 61/165 (2013.01); F02M 2200/505 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CZ DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1308618 A1 20030507; EP 1308618 B1 20041229; DE 10153627 A1 20031106; JP 2003148281 A 20030521

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091001

2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100501

2010-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091102

2010-07-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100630

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081222

- Year of fee payment: 7

2009-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20081021

- Year of fee payment: 7

2009-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20081027

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-12-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-12-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050930

2005-02-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50201879 P 20050203

2005-01-26 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-12-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CZ DE FR IT

2004-12-29 [PG25 CZ] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CZ

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041229

2004-01-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031216

2004-01-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): CZ DE FR IT

2004-01-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031107

2003-05-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-05-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI