Global Patent Index - EP 1308927 B9

EP 1308927 B9 2009-02-25 - VOICE DATA PROCESSING DEVICE AND PROCESSING METHOD

Title (en)

VOICE DATA PROCESSING DEVICE AND PROCESSING METHOD

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUR VERARBEITUNG VON SPRACHDATEN UND VERFAHREN DER VERARBEITUNG

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT DE DONNEES VOCALES

Publication

EP 1308927 B9 (EN)

Application

EP 01956800 A

Priority

  • JP 0106708 W
  • JP 2000241062 A
  • JP 2000251969 A
  • JP 2000346675 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1308927A1] There is disclosed a speech processing device in which prediction taps for finding prediction values of the speech of high sound quality are extracted from the synthesized sound obtained on affording linear prediction coefficients and residual signals, generated from a preset code, to a speech synthesis filter, speech of high sound quality being higher in sound quality than the synthesized sound, and in which the prediction taps are used along with preset tap coefficients to perform preset predictive calculations to find the prediction values of the speech of high sound quality. The speech of high sound quality is higher in sound quality than the synthesized sound. The device includes a prediction tap extracting unit (45) for extracting, from the synthesized sound, the prediction taps used for predicting the speech of high sound quality, as target speech, the prediction values of which are to be found, and a class tap extraction unit (46) for extracting class taps, used for classifying the target speech to one of a plurality of classes, from the above code. The device also includes a classification unit (47) for finding the class of the target speech based on the class taps, acquisition unit for acquiring the tap coefficients associated with the class of the target speech from among the tap coefficients as found on learning from class to class, and a prediction unit (49) for finding the prediction values of the target speech using the prediction taps and the tap coefficients associated with the class of the target speech. <IMAGE>

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G10L 19/26 (2013.01); G10L 21/038 (2013.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G10L 21/038 (2013.01); G10L 19/26 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FI FR GB SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1308927 A1 20030507; EP 1308927 A4 20050928; EP 1308927 B1 20080716; EP 1308927 B9 20090225; DE 60134861 D1 20080828; DE 60140020 D1 20091105; DE 60143327 D1 20101202; EP 1944759 A2 20080716; EP 1944759 A3 20080730; EP 1944759 B1 20101020; EP 1944760 A2 20080716; EP 1944760 A3 20080730; EP 1944760 B1 20090923; NO 20021631 A 20020607; NO 20021631 D0 20020405; NO 20082401 A 20020607; NO 20082403 A 20020607; NO 326880 B1 20090309; TW 564398 B 20031201; US 2008027720 A1 20080131; US 7912711 B2 20110322; WO 0213183 A1 20020214

INPADOC legal status


2014-08-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130902

2014-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130803

2014-05-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140430

2014-05-22 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60134861

- Effective date: 20140301

2014-04-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130803

2014-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140301

2014-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130804

2014-04-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130803

2014-04-01 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2012-12-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120906

- Year of fee payment: 12

2012-12-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120822

- Year of fee payment: 12

2012-10-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20120813

- Year of fee payment: 12

2012-10-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20120821

- Year of fee payment: 12

2012-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120821

- Year of fee payment: 12

2012-08-16 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Document: DE 60134861

- Effective date: 20120614

2012-07-25 [REG GB 746] REGISTER NOTED 'LICENCES OF RIGHT' (SECT. 46/1977)

- Effective date: 20120703

2009-09-08 [REG SE RPOT] EP PATENT HAS BEEN REPUBLISHED WITH A CORRECTED SWEDISH TRANSLATION

2009-06-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20090417

2008-09-09 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2008-08-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60134861 P 20080828

2008-07-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR GB SE

2008-07-16 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2008-07-16 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR GB SE

2008-02-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G10L 19/14 20060101AFI20080110BHEP

2008-02-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G10L 21/02 20060101ALI20080110BHEP

2007-09-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070827

2005-09-28 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20050817

2005-09-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 10L 13/00 A

2005-09-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 10L 19/04 B

2005-09-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 10L 101/12 B

2004-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE FI FR GB LI SE

2003-05-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020415

2003-05-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-05-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI