Global Patent Index - EP 1309784 B1

EP 1309784 B1 2004-12-08 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR REGULATING AN OPERATING VARIABLE OF AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR REGULATING AN OPERATING VARIABLE OF AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR REGELUNG EINER BETRIEBSGRÖSSE EINER BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR REGULER UNE GRANDEUR DE FONCTIONNEMENT D'UN MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE

Publication

EP 1309784 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 01956349 A

Priority

  • DE 0102745 W
  • DE 10038991 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0212700A1] The invention relates to a method and a device for regulating an operating variable of an internal combustion engine. A controller which generates an output signal for regulating the operating variable depending on the deviation according to at least one variable parameter is provided. The value of this at least one parameter is switched over to values that are specially adapted to the route in the respective operating mode, according to the operating mode (shift operation, homogenous operation, homogenous lean operation).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02D 41/30; F02D 41/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02P 5/15 (2006.01); F02D 29/02 (2006.01); F02D 41/02 (2006.01); F02D 41/08 (2006.01); F02D 41/16 (2006.01); F02D 41/30 (2006.01); F02D 41/34 (2006.01); F02D 45/00 (2006.01); F02D 31/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/3029 (2013.01); F02D 41/16 (2013.01); F02D 31/003 (2013.01); F02D 2041/1409 (2013.01); F02D 2041/1422 (2013.01); F02P 5/1508 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 0212700 A1 20020214; CN 1436280 A 20030813; DE 10038991 A1 20020221; EP 1309784 A1 20030514; EP 1309784 B1 20041208; JP 2004506122 A 20040226; KR 20030036680 A 20030509; US 2003168036 A1 20030911

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20180201

2018-02-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50104772

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160927

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150731

2016-04-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150720

2016-04-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160331

2014-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140724

- Year of fee payment: 14

2014-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140724

- Year of fee payment: 14

2005-11-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050909

2005-10-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-01-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50104772 P 20050113

2005-01-12 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-12-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2004-05-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2003-06-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KUSTOSCH, MARIO

2003-06-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KOEHLER, CHRISTIAN

2003-05-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030310

2003-05-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-05-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI