Global Patent Index - EP 1311738 B1

EP 1311738 B1 2009-02-18 - SUPPORT ARRANGEMENT

Title (en)

SUPPORT ARRANGEMENT

Title (de)

STÜTZANORDNUNG

Title (fr)

AGENCEMENT DE SUPPORT

Publication

EP 1311738 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 01958105 A

Priority

  • FI 0100675 W
  • FI 20001815 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0214639A1] The invention relates to a support arrangement for balcony glazing or a similar movable element (1), the arrangement comprising a first guide rail (2) for two support/wheel units (3) of the element, which are movable in the longitudinal direction of the guide rail and carry substantially the weight of the element (1), and a second guide rail (4) against which a guiding means (5) protruding from the opposite edge with respect to the support/wheel unit (3) of the element (1) is arranged to rest, especially a support arrangement in which the element (1) is arranged to travel on a track which comprises at least two first, and respectively second, guide rails (2, 4) arranged at an angle with respect to each other. The adjacent first, and respectively second, guide rails (2, 4), form a mitre joint (17) with each other. The support/wheel unit (3) comprises a frame part (7), which is supported on the element (1) in a non-pivoting manner, and to which frame part (7) is connected a wheel (8) for supporting and conveying the element (1), and that the first guide rail (2) comprises a groove (12), in which the shaft-like part (6) comprised in the frame part (7) is arranged to move laterally in a controlled manner, and on at least one side of which groove is a guide surface (11) for the wheel (8).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/50 (2006.01); E04B 1/00 (2006.01); E05D 15/06 (2006.01); E05D 15/58 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05D 15/0652 (2013.01); E05D 15/0608 (2013.01); E05D 15/0613 (2013.01); E05D 15/063 (2013.01); E05D 15/0647 (2013.01); E05D 15/0665 (2013.01); E05D 15/0686 (2013.01); E05D 15/58 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/614 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/684 (2013.01); E05Y 2800/205 (2013.01); E05Y 2800/21 (2013.01); E05Y 2800/672 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/15 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0214639 A1 20020221; AT 423262 T 20090315; AU 7984301 A 20020225; DE 60137693 D1 20090402; DK 1311738 T3 20090602; EP 1311738 A1 20030521; EP 1311738 B1 20090218; ES 2321691 T3 20090610; FI 115244 B 20050331; FI 20001815 A0 20000816; FI 20001815 A 20020217; NO 20030720 A 20030409; NO 20030720 D0 20030214; NO 321667 B1 20060619

INPADOC legal status


2017-11-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20170718

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20170718

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170721

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-10-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170801

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-09-30 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090218

2011-09-22 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: LUMON INVEST OY

- Effective date: 20110912

2011-08-31 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090218

2011-07-28 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: LUMON INVEST OY, FI

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: LMN FINANCE OY, TUUSULA, FI

- Document: DE 60137693

- Effective date: 20110609

2011-07-28 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60137693

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE DIPL.-ING. WALTER JACKISCH & PA, DE

- Effective date: 20110609

2011-07-06 [27C] TERMINATION OF OPPOSITION PROCEDURE

- Effective date: 20110228

2011-04-29 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090718

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090218

2010-10-29 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090519

2010-07-30 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090718

2010-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090718

2010-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090731

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090731

2010-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090731

2010-04-28 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2010-04-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100331

2010-03-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090718

2010-03-10 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: LMN FINANCE OY

2010-02-26 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090731

2010-02-26 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2010-02-12 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

2009-12-23 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: LUMON INVEST OY

- Effective date: 20091118

2009-10-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090727

2009-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090218

2009-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090218

2009-08-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2009-07-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090218

2009-07-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090218

2009-06-10 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2321691 T3

2009-06-02 [REG DK T3] EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS

2009-04-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60137693 P 20090402

2009-03-18 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2009-02-27 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2009-02-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2007-03-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ILOXI OY

2003-05-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030317

2003-05-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-05-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI