Global Patent Index - EP 1313071 A3

EP 1313071 A3 2003-06-04 - Modular device for dispensing items

Title (en)

Modular device for dispensing items

Title (de)

Modulare Vorrichtung zur Ausgabe von Gegenständen

Title (fr)

Dispositif modulaire de distribution d'objets

Publication

EP 1313071 A3 (FR)

Application

EP 02356204 A

Priority

FR 0113457 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2831307A1] Method for automatic distribution and return of objects, especially videos and DVDs, stored in compartments of a storage magazine. To select or return an object a gripping device is used that only contacts one face of an object being selected in order to pull it out of its storage compartment or out of a drum mechanism for return of the object. The invention also relates to a corresponding device.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07F 11/16; G07F 7/06; G07F 11/42

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07F 7/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07F 7/069 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

EPO simple patent family

FR 2831307 A1 20030425; FR 2831307 B1 20040326; EP 1313071 A2 20030521; EP 1313071 A3 20030604

INPADOC legal status


2004-09-01 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031205

2004-04-01 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-02-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-05-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-05-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI