Global Patent Index - EP 1315459 A1

EP 1315459 A1 2003-06-04 - METHOD FOR TRANSDERMAL NUCLEIC ACID SAMPLING

Title (en)

METHOD FOR TRANSDERMAL NUCLEIC ACID SAMPLING

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR TRANSDERMALEN NUKLEINSÄUREENTNAHME

Title (fr)

METHODE D'ECHANTILLONNAGE D'ACIDE NUCLEIQUE TRANSDERMIQUE

Publication

EP 1315459 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 01962273 A

Priority

  • US 0126102 W
  • US 22767500 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0215800A1] A minimally invasive transdermal nucleic acid sampling method comprises piercing through the outermost layer of the skin (20) and into the underlying epidermis with a plurality of microprojections (4). Living skin cells in the underlying epidermis are disrupted, causing them to release their contents including their nucleic acids (i.e., DNA, RNA, fragments thereof or other polynucleic acid material found in teh cleic and/or mitochondria of cells). The nucleic acid is collected on the surfaces of the microprojections and/or in a separate nucleic acid collection reservoir. The collected nucleic acid is then analyzed using standard polymerase chain reaction (PCR) techniques. Optionally a suction device (10) applies a partial vacuum through openings (8) in the microprojetion member (6) to the microcuts in the skin (20) for enhance defflux of intraelular and extracellular (i.e., body) fluids containing the nucleic acid.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61B 17/20; A61B 10/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 33/48 (2006.01); A61B 10/00 (2006.01); A61B 17/20 (2006.01); C12M 1/26 (2006.01); C12Q 1/24 (2006.01); C12Q 1/68 (2006.01); G01N 1/04 (2006.01); G01N 33/50 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61B 10/0045 (2013.01); A61B 17/205 (2013.01); A61B 2010/008 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0215800A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0215800 A1 20020228; AU 2001283469 B2 20060706; AU 8346901 A 20020304; CA 2420343 A1 20020228; CN 1471378 A 20040128; EP 1315459 A1 20030604; JP 2004506914 A 20040304; KR 20030068127 A 20030819; MX PA03001694 A 20041101

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-26 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20090303

2007-06-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050602

2006-10-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050602

2005-07-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050602

2003-06-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030321

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI