Global Patent Index - EP 1315499 A1

EP 1315499 A1 2003-06-04 - COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR THE TREATMENT OF ANORECTAL DISORDERS

Title (en)

COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR THE TREATMENT OF ANORECTAL DISORDERS

Title (de)

ZUSAMMENSTELLUNGEN UND METHODEN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON ANOREKTALEN ERKRANKUNGEN

Title (fr)

COMPOSITIONS ET METHODES DESTINEES AU TRAITEMENT DES TROUBLES ANORECTAUX

Publication

EP 1315499 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 01957348 A

Priority

  • US 0123971 W
  • US 22226700 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0209714A1] Compositions and methods for the treatment of anorectal disorders are provided in which certain combinations of NO donors, PDE inhibitors, superoxide (O2<->) scavengers, beta -adrenergic agonists, cAMP-dependent protein kinase activators, alpha 1-adrenergic antagonists, L-type Ca<2+> channel blockers, estrogens, ATP-sensitive <+> channel activators and smooth muscle relaxants are used.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 31/52; A61K 31/135; A61K 31/335

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 45/00 (2006.01); A61K 31/04 (2006.01); A61K 31/137 (2006.01); A61K 31/517 (2006.01); A61K 31/519 (2006.01); A61K 31/522 (2006.01); A61K 31/554 (2006.01); A61P 1/00 (2006.01); A61P 9/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/137 (2013.01); A61K 31/517 (2013.01); A61K 31/519 (2013.01); A61K 31/522 (2013.01); A61K 31/554 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0209714 A1 20020207; WO 0209714 A9 20030306; AU 7910401 A 20020213; CA 2417848 A1 20020207; EP 1315499 A1 20030604; EP 1315499 A4 20070905; IL 154202 D0 20030731; JP 2004516244 A 20040603; KR 100863758 B1 20081016; KR 20030024826 A 20030326; KR 20080068145 A 20080722; KR 20100017750 A 20100216; MX PA03000931 A 20040812

INPADOC legal status


2008-02-20 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080114

2007-09-05 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20070808

2007-06-27 [111Z] REGISTERING OF LICENCES OR OTHER RIGHTS

- Free text: ATBECHCYDEDKESFIFRGBGRIEITLUMCNLPTSETR

- Effective date: 20070517

2007-05-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: STRAKAN INTERNATIONAL LIMITED

2007-05-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: CELLEGY PHARMACEUTICALS, INC

2007-05-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: CELLEGY PHARMACEUTICALS, INC

2004-03-31 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: PARKS, THOMAS, P.

2004-03-31 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MAK, VIVIEN

2004-03-31 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: LEE, JUNG-CHUNG

2004-03-31 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: LEE, CHARLES

2003-06-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030214

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI