Global Patent Index - EP 1315507 A2

EP 1315507 A2 2003-06-04 - HPV-SPECIFIC SHORT-MERS

Title (en)

HPV-SPECIFIC SHORT-MERS

Title (de)

HPV-SPEZIFISCHE KURZE OLIGOMERE

Title (fr)

OLIGOMERS COURTS SPECIFIQUE AU HPV

Publication

EP 1315507 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 01931140 A

Priority

  • US 0140501 W
  • US 19599600 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0177294A2] The invention provides oligonucleotides capable of inhibiting human papillomavirus (HPV) replication. More specifically, the invention provides oligonucleotides complementary to the translational start site of the HPV E1 open reading frame which inhibit HPV replication through interaction with a nucleic acid or a protein target. Oligonucleotides of the invention contain at least 4 deoxyribonucleotides and/or ribonucleotides and may include a variety of modifications to the internucleotide linkages or the mononucleotides. Furthermore, the invention provides pharmaceutical compositions and methods for treating disorders or diseases associated with HPV infection.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07H 21/02; A61K 31/7105; A61K 31/711; A61K 31/7125; A61P 31/20; C07H 21/04; C12N 15/11

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/09 (2006.01); A61K 31/7125 (2006.01); A61K 48/00 (2006.01); A61P 15/00 (2006.01); A61P 17/12 (2006.01); A61P 31/20 (2006.01); A61P 35/00 (2006.01); C07K 14/025 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/005 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01); C12N 2710/20022 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0177294 A2 20011018; WO 0177294 A3 20020404; AU 5760401 A 20011023; CA 2406485 A1 20011018; EP 1315507 A2 20030604; EP 1315507 A4 20040616; JP 2004501614 A 20040122

INPADOC legal status


2009-11-20 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1056833

2005-11-09 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050505

2004-12-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041025

2004-06-16 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20040429

2004-06-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 07H 21/02 A

2004-06-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 07H 21/04 B

2004-06-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 12N 15/11 B

2004-06-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 31/7105 B

2004-06-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 31/711 B

2004-06-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 31/7125 B

2004-06-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61P 31/20 B

2004-06-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: MICROLOGIX BIOTECH, INC.

2003-06-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021111

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI