Global Patent Index - EP 1315529 A2

EP 1315529 A2 2003-06-04 - HIGHLY CONFORMABLE PERSONAL CARE PRODUCTS

Title (en)

HIGHLY CONFORMABLE PERSONAL CARE PRODUCTS

Title (de)

STARK ANPASSUNGSFÄHIGER HYGIENEARTIKEL

Title (fr)

ARTICLES D'HYGIENE PERSONNELLE EPOUSANT BIEN LES FORMES DU CORPS

Publication

EP 1315529 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 01968313 A

Priority

  • US 0127076 W
  • US 65418000 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0217982A2] There is provided a personal care product having a mixture made from an absorbent and a water soluble polymer, which, when wetted and subjected to a minimal force, will become a gel. Such a personal care product is more conformable, and thus more comfortable than typical personal care products. Such a product also allows fluid flow to other parts of the product and so uses less material in its construction, further reducing feelings of discomfort.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61L 15/60; A61L 15/42

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61F 13/53 (2006.01); A61F 5/44 (2006.01); A61F 13/00 (2006.01); A61F 13/15 (2006.01); A61F 13/20 (2006.01); A61F 13/49 (2006.01); A61L 15/42 (2006.01); A61L 15/60 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61F 13/531 (2013.01); A61L 15/42 (2013.01); A61L 15/60 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0217982A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 0217982 A2 20020307; WO 0217982 A3 20020613; AR 033835 A1 20040107; AU 8856801 A 20020313; BR 0113151 A 20030708; CN 1449296 A 20031015; EP 1315529 A2 20030604; JP 2004507323 A 20040311; KR 20030029886 A 20030416; MX PA03001103 A 20030527; ZA 200300677 B 20040218

INPADOC legal status


2005-12-21 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050601

2004-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-08-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030710

2003-08-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: DALEY, MICHAEL, ALLEN

2003-08-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: LATIMER, MARGARET, GWYN

2003-06-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030328

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI