Global Patent Index - EP 1315617 A1

EP 1315617 A1 2003-06-04 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING FLEXOGRAPHIC PRINTING PLATES BY MEANS OF LASER ENGRAVING

Title (en)

METHOD FOR PRODUCING FLEXOGRAPHIC PRINTING PLATES BY MEANS OF LASER ENGRAVING

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON FLEXODRUCKPLATTEN MITTELS LASERGRAVUR

Title (fr)

PROCEDE POUR PRODUIRE DES PLAQUES D'IMPRESSION FLEXOGRAPHIQUE PAR GRAVURE AU LASER

Publication

EP 1315617 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 02722235 A

Priority

  • DE 10113926 A
  • EP 0202954 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE10113926A1] The finely-divided filler in a layer used in laser engraving for manufacture of a flexographic printing element is an oxide, silicate or zeolitic solid of particle size 1-40nm at 0.1-8 wt.% and the relief layer is transparent. The process comprising conventional laser engraving on a layer which is fully crosslinked by actinic light and which comprises an elastomer binder, polymerizable compound, initiator (system) and finely-divided filler on a 3-D support.

[origin: DE10113926A1] The invention relates to a method for producing flexographic printing forms by engraving a printing relief on a flexographic printing element that can be laser engraved, said element having a photochemically cross-linked relief layer. The relief layer is transparent and comprises oxidic, siliceous or zeolitic solid matter with a particle size of between 1 and 400 nm in a quantity of between 0.1 and 8 wt. % in relation to the quantity of all components in the relief layer.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41C 1/05

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41C 1/05 (2006.01); B41N 1/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41C 1/05 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 02076739A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

DE 10113926 A1 20020926; EP 1315617 A1 20030604; EP 1315617 B1 20031217; JP 2004533343 A 20041104; US 2004089180 A1 20040513; US 6935236 B2 20050830; WO 02076739 A1 20021003

INPADOC legal status


2018-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180529

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20180322

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20180326

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20180326

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-03-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-03-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-03-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-03-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 14

2006-04-28 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2004-12-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040920

2004-10-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-07-28 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-05-25 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20031217

2004-02-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040121

2004-01-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50200155 P 20040129

2004-01-28 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-12-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-12-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-06-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030312

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI