Global Patent Index - EP 1315630 A1

EP 1315630 A1 2003-06-04 - METHOD FOR DIAGNOSING A TANK VENTILATION VALVE AND ELECTRONIC CONTROL DEVICE

Title (en)

METHOD FOR DIAGNOSING A TANK VENTILATION VALVE AND ELECTRONIC CONTROL DEVICE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR DIAGNOSE DES TANKENTLÜFTUNGSVENTILS UND ELEKTRONISCHE STEUEREINRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE DIAGNOSTIC DE LA SOUPAPE DE VENTILATION DU RESERVOIR A CARBURANT ET DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE

Publication

EP 1315630 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01962667 A

Priority

  • DE 0103225 W
  • DE 10043071 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0218165A1] The invention relates to a method for testing the operativeness of a tank ventilation valve between a combustion engine and a fuel vapour storage device. According to the method, the stored fuel vapour is fed from the fuel vapour storage device to the internal combustion engine when the tank ventilation valve is open, the supply of fuel vapour representing a first flow of energy to the combustion engine, and air also flows to the internal combustion engine via a throttle valve, a second flow of energy being associated with this air. Means are provided for keeping the sum of the two energy flows at a predetermined value and the tank ventilation valve is actuated for opening. A change in the energy flow delta E resulting from the opening actuation is determined by the throttle valve and compared with a predetermined threshold. A slight change in the energy flow that does not exceed the threshold value (threshold) is considered an error.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B60K 15/03; F02M 25/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02P 5/15 (2006.01); F02D 41/02 (2006.01); F02D 41/04 (2006.01); F02D 45/00 (2006.01); F02M 25/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 25/0809 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0218165A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR IT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0218165 A1 20020307; CN 1283483 C 20061108; CN 1450962 A 20031022; DE 10043071 A1 20020314; DE 50114397 D1 20081120; EP 1315630 A1 20030604; EP 1315630 B1 20081008; ES 2311022 T3 20090201; JP 2004507664 A 20040311; JP 2011252499 A 20111215; US 2004040537 A1 20040304; US 6886397 B2 20050503

INPADOC legal status


2015-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140901

2015-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150303

2015-05-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150430

2015-05-28 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50114397

- Effective date: 20150303

2015-04-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140823

2015-03-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50114397

2014-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20131025

- Year of fee payment: 13

2013-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20130826

- Year of fee payment: 13

2013-11-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130820

- Year of fee payment: 13

2013-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110824

2013-05-31 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20130531

2013-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110824

2012-04-03 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2011-09-15 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Document: DE 50114397

- Effective date: 20110720

2011-07-27 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Document: DE 50114397

2010-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20100823

- Year of fee payment: 10

2010-10-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20100830

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-09-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20090709

2009-02-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2311022 T3

2009-01-27 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2008-11-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50114397 P 20081120

2008-10-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT SE

2008-07-09 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: METHOD FOR DIAGNOSING A TANK VENTILATION VALVE AND ELECTRONIC CONTROL DEVICE

2006-11-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041006

2004-11-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041006

2004-05-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT SE

2003-06-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030401

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR