Global Patent Index - EP 1315640 A1

EP 1315640 A1 2003-06-04 - CARGO MANAGEMENT SYSTEM USEFUL AS A TABLE

Title (en)

CARGO MANAGEMENT SYSTEM USEFUL AS A TABLE

Title (de)

GEPÄCKVERSTAUSYSTEM VERWENDBAR ALS TISCH

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE GESTION DE CHARGEMENT POUVANT SERVIR DE TABLE

Publication

EP 1315640 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 01968754 A

Priority

  • US 0128282 W
  • US 23100800 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0220311A1] The cargo management device (24) includes a frame having a pair of parallel support beams extending between a first and second end. The frame may be made of multiple frame portions that are attached to each other using hinges or other like mechanisms. The frame also has a plurality of cross beams extending between the pair of parallel support beams. A plurality of securing devices allows articles to be attached or secured to the frame between the frame and the vehicle floor (18). The cargo management device (24) also includes an attachment mechanism attaching the frame to the two opposing sidewalls (12,14) of the motor vehicle spaced apart from the vehicle floor (18) so that the articles being stored may be suspended from the frame or organized using netting and the like.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B60R 5/04; B60R 7/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60R 5/04 (2006.01); B60R 7/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B60R 7/02 (2013.01); B60R 5/045 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0220311A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 0220311 A1 20020314; AU 8897901 A 20020322; CA 2421745 A1 20020314; EP 1315640 A1 20030604

INPADOC legal status


2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SHAFER, RUSSELL, P., JR.

2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BURKE, MARTIN

2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: HOOT, ROBIN

2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SVENSON, RICHARD, N.

2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: GATTIS, CHRISTOPHER

2006-09-27 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060401

2004-06-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040430

2004-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-08-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SHAFER, RUSSELL, P., JR.

2003-08-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BURKE, MARTIN

2003-08-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: HOOT, ROBIN

2003-08-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SVENSON, RICHARD, N.

2003-08-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: GATTIS, CHRISTOPHER

2003-06-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030310

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI