Global Patent Index - EP 1315656 A1

EP 1315656 A1 2003-06-04 - HIGH SPEED MACHINE FOR INSERTING SHEETS INTO ENVELOPES

Title (en)

HIGH SPEED MACHINE FOR INSERTING SHEETS INTO ENVELOPES

Title (de)

HOCHGESCHWINDIGKEITSMASCHINE ZUM EINLEGEN VON BÖGEN IN BRIEFUMSCHLÄGEN

Title (fr)

MACHINE D'INSERTION A GRANDE VITESSE DE FEUILLES DANS DES ENVELOPPES

Publication

EP 1315656 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00932555 A

Priority

US 0013625 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: CA2374981A1] A speed machine (10) that inserts about twelve thousand sheets or stacks of sheets of paper per hour into the same number of envelopes comprising a firs t table (12) for delivering an elongate horizontal queue of thousands of envelopes to an envelope hopper (32); a second table (16) parallel to the first table (12) includes a plurality of independently controllable sheet feeders, and a third table (30) disposed transversely to the first two table s (12, 16) and includes the envelope insertion station.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 43/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B43M 3/04 (2006.01); B65D 43/26 (2006.01); B43M 5/04 (2006.01); B65B 25/14 (2006.01); B65B 35/02 (2006.01); B65B 35/46 (2006.01)

IPC 8 main group level (invention and additional information)

B65D (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B43M 3/045 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

AT 475604 T 20100815; AU 5025700 A 20011126; CA 2374981 A1 20011122; CA 2374981 C 20070501; CN 1360553 A 20020724; DE 60044756 D1 20100909; EP 1315656 A1 20030604; EP 1315656 A4 20080430; EP 1315656 B1 20100728; IL 148295 D0 20020912; JP 2003533411 A 20031111; PL 358453 A1 20040809

INPADOC legal status


2018-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20180525

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180529

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-05-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170530

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-05-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-30 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-05-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110517

2012-04-30 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110517

2012-02-29 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2012-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110531

2012-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110531

2011-12-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110531

2011-12-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2011-08-25 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 60044756

- Effective date: 20110429

2011-07-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20110429

2011-06-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20101108

2011-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100728

2011-04-29 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100728

2011-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100728

2011-03-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100728

2011-03-31 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20101029

2011-02-28 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100728

2011-02-28 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20101129

2011-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100728

2011-01-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100728

2011-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100728

2010-11-24 [REG NL VDEP] INVALID IN THE NETHERLANDS AS NO TRANSLATION HAS BEEN FILED

- Effective date: 20100728

2010-09-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60044756 P 20100909

2010-09-01 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2010-07-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2010-07-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2010-07-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2010-03-24 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: WERNER, TODD C.

2010-03-24 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MILO, ALFRED

2008-08-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080717

2008-04-30 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20080402

2008-04-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B65D 43/26 20060101AFI20011126BHEP

2008-04-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B43M 3/04 20060101ALI20080327BHEP

2006-06-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: WERNER, TODD C.

2006-06-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MILO, ALFRED

2004-06-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: PITNEY BOWES INC.

2004-06-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: WERNER, TODD C.

2004-06-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MILO, ALFRED

2003-06-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010730

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI