Global Patent Index - EP 1315659 A1

EP 1315659 A1 2003-06-04 - SINGLE-DOSE OR DOUBLE-DOSE DEVICE FOR DISPENSING A FLUID PRODUCT

Title (en)

SINGLE-DOSE OR DOUBLE-DOSE DEVICE FOR DISPENSING A FLUID PRODUCT

Title (de)

EINZELDOSIS ODER ZWEIDOSEN SPENDEVORRICHTUNG FÜR FLIESSFÄHIGES GUT

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE DISTRIBUTION DE PRODUIT FLUIDE DU TYPE MONODOSE OU BIDOSE

Publication

EP 1315659 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 01965365 A

Priority

  • FR 0102683 W
  • FR 0011425 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0220370A1] The invention concerns a fluid product dispensing device comprising a body (1), a reservoir unit (3), comprising a reservoir containing a single dose or two half doses of product, a dispensing member such as a piston (8) axially mobile in the reservoir (3) between a neutral position and a dispensing position, and an actuating element (5) mobile between a neutral position and an actuating position. The invention is characterised in that said actuating element (5) is arranged laterally and comprises an end part provided with a cam surface (6) co-operating with said dispensing member (8) or said reservoir unit `(3), the displacement of said actuating element (5) being produced in a different direction, and in particular about perpendicular, to the axial displacement direction of the dispensing member (8) relative to the reservoir.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 83/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 83/00 (2006.01); A61M 15/08 (2006.01); B05B 11/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 83/0005 (2013.01); B05B 11/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0220370A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0220370 A1 20020314; CN 1210192 C 20050713; CN 1471487 A 20040128; DE 60107268 D1 20041223; DE 60107268 T2 20051201; EP 1315659 A1 20030604; EP 1315659 B1 20041117; FR 2813592 A1 20020308; FR 2813592 B1 20030321; JP 2004525821 A 20040826; JP 4843182 B2 20111221

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170828

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170817

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-08-28 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-29 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-08-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-06-25 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60107268

- Representative's name: STAUDT IP LAW, DE

2014-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130828

2014-05-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130828

2014-04-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130828

2013-08-08 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: APTAR FRANCE SAS, FR

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: VALOIS S.A.S., LE NEUBOURG, FR

- Document: DE 60107268

- Effective date: 20130614

2013-08-08 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60107268

- Representative's name: BITTNER & PARTNER, DE

- Effective date: 20130614

2013-08-08 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60107268

- Representative's name: BITTNER & PARTNER RECHTS- UND PATENTANWAELTE, DE

- Effective date: 20130614

2013-08-08 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60107268

- Representative's name: STAUDT IP LAW, DE

- Effective date: 20130614

2013-06-14 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60107268

- Representative's name: BITTNER & PARTNER, DE

2013-02-08 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: APTAR FRANCE SAS, FR

- Effective date: 20130104

2012-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120821

- Year of fee payment: 12

2012-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120824

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-11-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050818

2005-06-29 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2005-03-16 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050221

2004-12-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60107268 P 20041223

2004-12-15 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2004-11-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-11-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-11-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: VALOIS S.A.S.

2003-06-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030207

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR