Global Patent Index - EP 1315679 A1

EP 1315679 A1 2003-06-04 - GLASS CERAMIC MASS AND CERAMIC ARTICLE

Title (en)

GLASS CERAMIC MASS AND CERAMIC ARTICLE

Title (de)

GLASKERAMIKMASSE UND KERAMIKKÖRPER

Title (fr)

MASSE VITROCERAMIQUE ET ARTICLE CERAMIQUE

Publication

EP 1315679 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01967053 A

Priority

  • DE 0103337 W
  • DE 10043194 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0218285A1] The invention relates to a glass ceramic mass, comprising at least one oxide ceramic, containing barium, titanium and at least one rare earth metal Rek and at least one glass material, containing at least one oxide with boron and at least one oxide of a rare earth metal Reg. The glass material further contains either an oxide of a tetravalent metal Me4+, or at least one oxide of a pentavalent metal Me5+. A compression of the glass ceramic mass occurs above all by viscous flow. A low vitrification temperature can thus be achieved. Crystallisation products are produced during and/or after the compression. The rare earth oxide and the crystallisation products can be used to pre-determine each of a dielectric material property of the glass ceramic mass in a wide range such as permittivity (15 - 80), Q (350 - 5000) and Tf value (+/- 20 ppm/K). The glass ceramic mass is characterised by a vitrification temperature of below 850 DEG C and can thus find application in LTCC (low temperature cofired ceramics) technology for the integration of a passive electrical component in the volume of a ceramic multi-layer body. Suppression of a lateral shrinkage may be achieved in a composite with a ceramic film blank made from another ceramic material compressed at a higher temperature.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C03C 14/00; C03C 8/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C04B 35/46 (2006.01); C03C 8/14 (2006.01); C03C 14/00 (2006.01); H05K 1/03 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C03C 8/14 (2013.01); C03C 14/004 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0218285A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0218285 A1 20020307; CA 2422651 A1 20030227; CA 2422651 C 20070619; CN 1307117 C 20070328; CN 1556775 A 20041222; CZ 20030911 A3 20041215; DE 10043194 A1 20020328; EP 1315679 A1 20030604; HU 0300881 A2 20040728; JP 2004507429 A 20040311; KR 100532799 B1 20051202; KR 20030040431 A 20030522; MX PA03001713 A 20040910; NO 20030882 A 20030425; NO 20030882 D0 20030225; TW I224082 B 20041121; US 2004014584 A1 20040122

INPADOC legal status


2015-08-05 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20150303

2005-01-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: W.C. HERAEUS GMBH

2005-01-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: BUNDESANSTALT FUER MATERIALFORSCHUNG UND -PRUFUNG

2004-11-10 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: GLASS CERAMIC MASS AND CERAMIC ARTICLE

2003-11-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031006

2003-11-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: W.C. HERAEUS GMBH & CO. KG

2003-11-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: BUNDESANSTALT FUER MATERIALFORSCHUNG UND -PRUFUNG

2003-06-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030318

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: SI