Global Patent Index - EP 1315705 A1

EP 1315705 A1 2003-06-04 - BICYCLIC HETEROCYCLES, MEDICAMENTS CONTAINING THESE COMPOUNDS, THEIR USE, AND METHODS FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF

Title (en)

BICYCLIC HETEROCYCLES, MEDICAMENTS CONTAINING THESE COMPOUNDS, THEIR USE, AND METHODS FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF

Title (de)

BICYCLISCHE HETEROCYCLEN, DIESE VERBINDUNGEN ENTHALTENDE ARZNEIMITTEL, DEREN VERWENDUNG UND VEFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG

Title (fr)

HETEROCYCLES BICYCLIQUES, MEDICAMENTS CONTENANT LESDITS COMPOSES, LEUR UTILISATION ET PROCEDES PERMETTANT DE LES PRODUIRE

Publication

EP 1315705 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01967285 A

Priority

  • DE 10042058 A
  • EP 0109532 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0218351A1] The invention relates to bicyclic heterocycles of general formula (I), in which Ra to Rc are defined as referred to in Claims Nos. 1 to 7, to their tautomers, their stereoisomers, and to their salts, particularly their physiologically compatible salts with inorganic or organic acids or bases, which have valuable pharmacological properties, in particular, an inhibitive effect on the signal transduction imparted by tyrosine kinases. The invention also relates to the use of said bicyclic heterocycles for treating diseases, especially tumor diseases, disorders of the lung and of the respiratory tract, and to the production thereof.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07D 239/94; A61K 31/517; A61P 35/00; C07D 405/12; C07D 413/12; C07D 413/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/517 (2006.01); A61P 1/04 (2006.01); A61P 1/16 (2006.01); A61P 11/00 (2006.01); A61P 11/06 (2006.01); A61P 11/08 (2006.01); A61P 13/12 (2006.01); A61P 17/00 (2006.01); A61P 27/16 (2006.01); A61P 35/00 (2006.01); A61P 35/04 (2006.01); A61P 37/08 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01); C07D 239/94 (2006.01); C07D 405/12 (2006.01); C07D 413/12 (2006.01); C07D 413/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07D 405/12 (2013.01); C07D 239/94 (2013.01); C07D 413/12 (2013.01); C07D 413/14 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0218351A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0218351 A1 20020307; AR 033562 A1 20031226; AU 2001287694 B2 20070906; AU 8769401 A 20020313; BG 107559 A 20031031; BR 0113519 A 20030701; CA 2417897 A1 20030130; CA 2417897 C 20090331; CN 100404517 C 20080723; CN 1449390 A 20031015; CZ 302567 B6 20110713; DE 10042058 A1 20020307; EA 005679 B1 20050428; EA 200300219 A1 20030828; EC SP034464 A 20030331; EE 05269 B1 20100215; EE 200300077 A 20041215; EP 1315705 A1 20030604; HK 1057557 A1 20081031; HR P20030138 A2 20050430; HU 0300819 A2 20030929; HU 0300819 A3 20080328; IL 154602 A 20080708; IL 154602 D0 20030917; JP 2004507529 A 20040311; JP 4834282 B2 20111214; KR 100862873 B1 20081015; KR 20030024914 A 20030326; ME P58708 A 20110510; MX PA03001483 A 20030606; MY 126132 A 20060929; NO 20030870 A 20030225; NO 20030870 D0 20030225; NO 324866 B1 20071217; NZ 524668 A 20060630; PL 360248 A1 20040906; RS 52279 B 20121031; SK 2312003 A3 20031007; SK 287747 B6 20110804; TW I294422 B 20080311; UA 73004 C2 20030616; UY 26903 A1 20020322; YU 14003 A 20060116; ZA 200300991 B 20040416

INPADOC legal status


2014-11-12 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20140626

2014-06-26 [REG DE R003] REFUSAL DECISION NOW FINAL

2005-08-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050621

2003-07-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: HIMMELSBACH, FRANK

2003-07-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: LANGKOPF, ELKE

2003-07-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: JUNG, BIRGIT

2003-07-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BLECH, STEFAN

2003-07-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SOLCA, FLAVIO

2003-06-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMA GMBH & CO.KG

2003-06-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030326

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI