Global Patent Index - EP 1315707 A1

EP 1315707 A1 2003-06-04 - LIPO- OR AMPHIPHILIC SCINTILLATORS AND THEIR USE IN ASSAYS

Title (en)

LIPO- OR AMPHIPHILIC SCINTILLATORS AND THEIR USE IN ASSAYS

Title (de)

LIPO- ODER AMPHIPHILE SCINTILLATOREN UND IHRE VERWENDUNG IN ASSAYS

Title (fr)

SCINTILLATEURS LIPOPHILES OU AMPHIPHILES ET LEUR UTILISATION POUR DES BIOANALYSES

Publication

EP 1315707 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 01956714 A

Priority

  • GB 0103695 W
  • GB 0020503 A
  • US 24799400 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0214290A1] The invention provides scintillator molecules, consisting of one or more X moieties, which is a phosphor, covalently attached to one or more R<1> moieties which is a lipophilic or amphiphilic group, wherein the scintillator molecule is capable of integrating into a cell, a cell membrane, a biological membrane, an artificial membrane or a delivery vehicle and when integrated can act as a phosphor. Preferred seintillator molecules are of formula. Also provided are liposomes or micelles containing the novel scintillator compounds, methods for preparing the liposomes or micelles containing the novel scintillator compounds and the use of the liposomes or micelles as delivery vehicles to insert the scintillator compounds into the cell membranes of cells. In addition, the invention provides cells containing the novel scintillator compounds and the use of the cells in assay systems.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07D 263/32; C12N 5/00; G01N 33/50; G01N 33/58; G01N 33/92

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07D 263/32 (2006.01); C09K 11/06 (2006.01); G01N 33/50 (2006.01); G01N 33/58 (2006.01); G01N 33/92 (2006.01); G01T 1/20 (2006.01); G01T 1/204 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01N 33/502 (2013.01); C07D 263/32 (2013.01); G01N 33/5008 (2013.01); G01N 33/58 (2013.01); G01N 33/92 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0214290A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0214290 A1 20020221; AU 7863301 A 20020225; BR 0113328 A 20030729; CA 2420006 A1 20020221; CN 1458925 A 20031126; EP 1315707 A1 20030604; GB 0306216 D0 20030423; GB 2383329 A 20030625; IL 154485 D0 20030917; JP 2004506754 A 20040304; KR 20030066601 A 20030809

INPADOC legal status


2004-09-15 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040302

2004-01-02 [111L] LICENCES

- Free text: 0100 LECTUS THERAPEUTICS LTD

- Effective date: 20031013

2003-08-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SENSE PROTEOMIC LIMITED

2003-06-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SENSE PROTEOMIC LIMITED

2003-06-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: PROCOGNIA LTD

2003-06-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030318

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI