Global Patent Index - EP 1315713 A2

EP 1315713 A2 2003-06-04 - METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF MACROCYCLIC ESTERS

Title (en)

METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF MACROCYCLIC ESTERS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG MAKROCYCLISCHER ESTER

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION D'ESTER MACROCYCLIQUE

Publication

EP 1315713 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 01974158 A

Priority

  • DE 10041198 A
  • EP 0109248 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0216345A2] Macrocyclic ester compounds may be produced from oligoesters by thermal cleavage in the presence of a thermostable benzene derivative.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07D 315/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07D 313/00 (2006.01); C07B 61/00 (2006.01); C07D 315/00 (2006.01); C07D 321/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07D 315/00 (2013.01); C07D 321/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0216345A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB LI NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 0216345 A2 20020228; WO 0216345 A3 20020523; AU 9375301 A 20020304; DE 10041198 A1 20020314; DE 10041198 B4 20040115; EP 1315713 A2 20030604; JP 2004524265 A 20040812; US 2002095045 A1 20020718; US 6458972 B1 20021001

INPADOC legal status


2004-09-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040302

2004-05-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB LI NL

2003-12-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031020

2003-10-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SURBURG, HORST

2003-10-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MUELLER, DIRK

2003-10-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KLEIN, STEPHAN

2003-10-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MENDOZA-FROHN, CHRISTINE

2003-10-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: RONGE, GEORG

2003-10-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: VERKERK, KAI

2003-09-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SYMRISE GMBH & CO. KG

2003-06-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030324

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI