Global Patent Index - EP 1315717 A1

EP 1315717 A1 2003-06-04 - QUINAZOLINE DERIVATIVES, MEDICAMENTS CONTAINING THESE COMPOUNDS, THEIR USE, AND METHODS FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF

Title (en)

QUINAZOLINE DERIVATIVES, MEDICAMENTS CONTAINING THESE COMPOUNDS, THEIR USE, AND METHODS FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF

Title (de)

CHINAZOLIN DERIVATE , DIESE VERBINDUNGEN ENTHALTENDE ARZNEIMITTEL, DEREN VERWENDUNG UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG

Title (fr)

DERIVES DE QUINAZOLINE, MEDICAMENTS CONTENANT LESDITS COMPOSES, LEUR UTILISATION ET PROCEDES PERMETTANT DE LES PRODUIRE

Publication

EP 1315717 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01962953 A

Priority

  • DE 10042060 A
  • EP 0109537 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0218373A1] The invention relates to bicyclic heterocycles of general formula (I), in which Ra, Rb, Rc and n are defined as referred to in Claim No. 1, to their tautomers, their stereoisomers, and to their salts, particularly their physiologically compatible salts with inorganic or organic acids or bases, which have valuable pharmacological properties, in particular, an inhibitive effect on the signal transduction imparted by tyrosine kinases. The invention also relates to the use of said bicyclic heterocycles for treating diseases, especially tumor diseases, disorders of the lung and of the respiratory tract, and to the production thereof.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07D 405/12; A61K 31/517; C07D 239/94; C07D 413/12; C07D 413/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07D 239/04 (2006.01); A61K 31/505 (2006.01); A61K 31/517 (2006.01); A61K 31/5377 (2006.01); A61P 1/00 (2006.01); A61P 1/04 (2006.01); A61P 1/16 (2006.01); A61P 1/18 (2006.01); A61P 11/00 (2006.01); A61P 11/02 (2006.01); A61P 11/06 (2006.01); A61P 11/14 (2006.01); A61P 13/12 (2006.01); A61P 17/00 (2006.01); A61P 17/06 (2006.01); A61P 29/00 (2006.01); A61P 35/00 (2006.01); A61P 35/04 (2006.01); A61P 37/02 (2006.01); A61P 37/08 (2006.01); C07D 239/94 (2006.01); C07D 405/12 (2006.01); C07D 413/12 (2006.01); C07D 413/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07D 405/12 (2013.01); A61K 31/505 (2013.01); C07D 239/94 (2013.01); C07D 413/12 (2013.01); C07D 413/14 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0218373A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0218373 A1 20020307; AU 8402101 A 20020313; CA 2417050 A1 20020307; CA 2417050 C 20090414; DE 10042060 A1 20020307; EP 1315717 A1 20030604; JP 2004517048 A 20040610; MX PA03000873 A 20030606

INPADOC legal status


2010-01-13 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20090725

2009-02-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090114

2003-07-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: HIMMELSBACH, FRANK

2003-07-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: LANGKOPF, ELKE

2003-07-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: JUNG, BIRGIT

2003-07-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BLECH, STEFAN

2003-07-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SOLCA, FLAVIO

2003-06-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMA KG & CO. KG

2003-06-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030326

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI