Global Patent Index - EP 1315738 A1

EP 1315738 A1 2003-06-04 - EXTENDED NATIVE CHEMICAL LIGATION

Title (en)

EXTENDED NATIVE CHEMICAL LIGATION

Title (de)

ERWEITERTE NATIVE CHEMISCHE LIGATION

Title (fr)

LIGATURE CHIMIQUE NATURELLE ETENDUE

Publication

EP 1315738 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 01968707 A

Priority

  • US 0128172 W
  • US 23133900 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0220557A1] The invention is directed to methods and compositions for chemical ligation of components comprising a first component having a carboxythioester, and preferable an alpha -carboxythioester, moiety and a second component having an N-substituted, and preferably an N alpha -substituted, 2 or 3 carbon chain alkyl or aryl thiol to give a ligation product having an N-substituted amide bond at the ligation site. The reactants of the invention are chemoselective, and the alkyl or aryl thiol moiety is removable from the ligation product. Removal of the alkyl or aryl thiol gives a native amide bond at the ligation site. The methods and compositions of the invention are particularly useful for ligation of peptides and polypeptides. The ligation system of the invention is applicable to a wide variety of molecules, and thus can be exploited to generate peptides, polypeptides and other amino acid containing polymers having a native amide bond at the ligation site.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07K 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07K 1/00 (2006.01); C07K 5/04 (2006.01); C07K 1/04 (2006.01); C07K 1/08 (2006.01); C07K 5/06 (2006.01); C07K 5/068 (2006.01); C07K 5/078 (2006.01); C07K 5/087 (2006.01); C07K 7/04 (2006.01); C07K 7/06 (2006.01); C07K 14/00 (2006.01); C07K 14/505 (2006.01); C07K 14/80 (2006.01); C12N 9/02 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/80 (2013.01); C07K 5/06026 (2013.01); C07K 5/06086 (2013.01); C07K 5/06147 (2013.01); C07K 5/0812 (2013.01); C07K 7/06 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0220557 A1 20020314; AU 2001288937 B2 20050428; AU 8893701 A 20020322; BR 0113579 A 20030617; BR 0113623 A 20040622; CA 2412298 A1 20020314; CN 1452632 A 20031029; EP 1315738 A1 20030604; EP 1315738 A4 20060607; ES 2360203 T3 20110601; IL 154015 D0 20030731; JP 2004508383 A 20040318; JP 2008150393 A 20080703; KR 20030061785 A 20030722; MX PA03001450 A 20041213; ZA 200300314 B 20040204; ZA 200300315 B 20040204; ZA 200300659 B 20040305

INPADOC legal status


2009-02-25 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080903

2008-03-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080221

2007-06-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: AMYLIN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.

2007-05-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: AMYLIN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.

2006-06-07 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20060504

2006-06-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C07K 1/00 20060101AFI20020318BHEP

2006-06-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C07K 7/06 20060101ALI20060427BHEP

2006-06-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C12N 9/02 20060101ALI20060427BHEP

2003-06-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030129

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI