Global Patent Index - EP 1315748 A2

EP 1315748 A2 2003-06-04 - GENE EXPRESSION, GENOME ALTERATION AND REPORTER EXPRESSION IN MYOFIBROBLASTS AND MYOFIBROBLAST-LIKE CELLS

Title (en)

GENE EXPRESSION, GENOME ALTERATION AND REPORTER EXPRESSION IN MYOFIBROBLASTS AND MYOFIBROBLAST-LIKE CELLS

Title (de)

GENEXPRESSION, GENOMALTERATION UND REPORTEREXPRESSION IN MYOFIBROBLASTEN UND MYOFIBROBLAST-ÄHNLICHEN ZELLEN

Title (fr)

EXPRESSION GENIQUE, ALTERATION GENOMIQUE ET EXPRESSION DE REPORTERS DANS DES MYOFIBROBLASTES ET DES CELLULES DE TYPE MYOFIBROBLASTE

Publication

EP 1315748 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 01962847 A

Priority

  • EP 01962847 A
  • DE 10033633 A
  • DE 10053879 A
  • EP 0107913 W
  • EP 00128446 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0204509A2] The invention relates to specific, regulatory sequence regions of the alpha smooth muscle actin gene (a-SMA gene), and fusion structures in which said regulatory sequence regions of the a-SMA gene are operationally linked to other functional nucleic acid sequences. The invention also relates to the use of said regulatory sequence regions for cell type specific and differentiation specific reporter expression, for cell type specific and differentiation specific gene changes (alteration, mutation) and for gene expression changes in cells and organisms.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07K 14/47

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A01K 67/027 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61K 48/00 (2006.01); A61P 1/16 (2006.01); A61P 11/00 (2006.01); A61P 13/12 (2006.01); A61P 17/02 (2006.01); A61P 19/08 (2006.01); A61P 25/00 (2006.01); A61P 35/00 (2006.01); C07K 14/47 (2006.01); C12N 1/15 (2006.01); C12N 1/19 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); C12N 15/09 (2006.01); C12N 15/85 (2006.01); C12Q 1/02 (2006.01); G01N 33/15 (2006.01); G01N 33/50 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A01K 67/0275 (2013.01); A61K 48/0058 (2013.01); C07K 14/4716 (2013.01); C12N 15/85 (2013.01); A01K 2217/05 (2013.01); C12N 2800/30 (2013.01); C12N 2830/008 (2013.01); C12N 2830/42 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0204509A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0204509 A2 20020117; WO 0204509 A3 20020801; AU 8393701 A 20020121; DE 10053879 A1 20020207; EP 1315748 A2 20030604; JP 2004502448 A 20040129; US 2004106565 A1 20040603

INPADOC legal status


2007-04-25 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20061103

2006-07-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041025

2006-03-08 [19U] INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS BEFORE GRANT

- Effective date: 20051201

2006-03-08 [19W] RESUMPTION OF PROCEEDINGS BEFORE GRANT (AFTER INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS)

- Effective date: 20060601

2004-12-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041025

2003-06-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030210

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI