Global Patent Index - EP 1315751 A2

EP 1315751 A2 2003-06-04 - TWO RECEPTORS OF MEIOSIS ACTIVATING STEROLS DESIGNATED SAM1A AND SAM1B

Title (en)

TWO RECEPTORS OF MEIOSIS ACTIVATING STEROLS DESIGNATED SAM1A AND SAM1B

Title (de)

ZWEI REZEPTOREN VON MEIOSIS AKTIVIERENDEN STEROLEN, DIE ALS SAM1A UND SAM1B BEZEICHNET WERDEN

Title (fr)

DEUX RECEPTEURS D'UN STEROL ACTIVATEUR DE MEIOSE DESIGNES SAM1A ET SAM1B

Publication

EP 1315751 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 01957793 A

Priority

  • DK 0100558 W
  • DK PA200001259 A
  • DK 0100550 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0216433A2] Two receptors of meiosis activating sterols designated SAM1A and SAM1B have been identified.

[origin: WO0216433A2] Two receptors of meiosis activating sterols designated SAM1a and SAM1b have been identified.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07K 14/705; C07K 16/28; C12N 15/11; C12N 15/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 33/50 (2006.01); A61K 45/00 (2006.01); A61P 15/08 (2006.01); A61P 15/18 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01); C07K 14/47 (2006.01); C07K 14/705 (2006.01); C07K 14/72 (2006.01); C07K 16/18 (2006.01); C07K 16/28 (2006.01); C12N 1/19 (2006.01); C12N 1/21 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); C12N 15/09 (2006.01); C12N 15/12 (2006.01); C12P 21/02 (2006.01); C12P 21/08 (2006.01); C12Q 1/68 (2006.01); G01N 33/15 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/72 (2013.01); C07K 14/705 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0216433A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0216433 A2 20020228; WO 0216433 A3 20020627; AU 7961601 A 20020304; EP 1315751 A2 20030604; JP 2004506446 A 20040304

INPADOC legal status


2007-08-22 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070224

2007-05-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: NOVO NORDISK A/S

2007-05-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: BAYER SCHERING PHARMA AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

2007-04-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: NOVO NORDISK A/S

2007-04-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: BAYER SCHERING PHARMA AG

2006-11-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20061013

2003-06-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030325

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI