Global Patent Index - EP 1315760 A2

EP 1315760 A2 2003-06-04 - ENDOGLIN-SPECIFIC POLYPEPTIDE, PRODUCTION AND USE THEREOF

Title (en)

ENDOGLIN-SPECIFIC POLYPEPTIDE, PRODUCTION AND USE THEREOF

Title (de)

ENDOGLIN SPEZIFISCHES POLYPEPTID, SEINE HERSTELLUNG UND VERWENDUNG

Title (fr)

POLYPEPTIDE SPECIFIQUE DE L'ENDOGLINE, SA FABRICATION ET SON UTILISATION

Publication

EP 1315760 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 01980336 A

Priority

  • DE 10043481 A
  • EP 0110197 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0220614A2] The invention relates to a polypeptide which specifically binds to the extracellular domain of the human endoglin (CD105) protein, and the production and use thereof.

[origin: WO0220614A2] Die vorliegende Erfindung betrifft ein Polypeptide, das spezifisch an die extrazelluläre Domäne des humanen Endoglin (CD105) Proteins bindet, sowie seine Herstellung und Verwendung.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07K 16/28; A61K 31/7088; A61K 39/395; A61K 47/48; A61P 35/00; C07K 19/00; C12N 5/10; C12N 15/13; C12N 15/62; C12N 15/79; G01N 33/53; G01N 33/563; G01N 33/68

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/09 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61K 48/00 (2006.01); A61P 35/00 (2006.01); C07K 16/28 (2006.01); C07K 16/46 (2006.01); C07K 19/00 (2006.01); C12N 1/15 (2006.01); C12N 1/19 (2006.01); C12N 1/21 (2006.01); C12N 5/02 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); C12P 21/02 (2006.01); C12P 21/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 16/2896 (2013.01); C07K 16/468 (2013.01); A61K 2039/505 (2013.01); C07K 2317/565 (2013.01); C07K 2317/622 (2013.01); C07K 2319/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0220614A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0220614 A2 20020314; WO 0220614 A3 20020801; CA 2421202 A1 20030304; DE 10043481 A1 20020411; EP 1315760 A2 20030604; JP 2004508035 A 20040318; US 2004053329 A1 20040318

INPADOC legal status


2007-10-31 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070331

2005-09-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: PHARMEXA A/S

2005-01-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: VECTRON THERAPEUTICS AG

2004-12-22 [19U] INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS BEFORE GRANT

- Effective date: 20040601

2004-12-22 [19W] RESUMPTION OF PROCEEDINGS BEFORE GRANT (AFTER INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS)

- Effective date: 20050301

2003-06-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030304

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR