Global Patent Index - EP 1315762 A1

EP 1315762 A1 2003-06-04 - DETERMINING THE CONCENTRATION OF POLYASPARTIC ACID USING FLUOROMETRY

Title (en)

DETERMINING THE CONCENTRATION OF POLYASPARTIC ACID USING FLUOROMETRY

Title (de)

POLYASPARAGINSÄURE-KONZENTRATIONSBESTIMMUNG MITTELS FLUOROMETRIE

Title (fr)

DETERMINATION DE LA CONCENTRATION EN ACIDE POLYASPARTIQUE PAR FLUOROMETRIE

Publication

EP 1315762 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01960679 A

Priority

  • DE 10042498 A
  • EP 0109557 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0218458A1] The invention relates to a method for determining, in aqueous solutions, the concentration of polyaspartic acid and/or the salts thereof.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C08F 8/30; C08G 69/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C08F 8/30 (2006.01); C08G 69/10 (2006.01); C08G 73/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C08G 73/1092 (2013.01); C08F 8/30 (2013.01); C08G 69/10 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0218458A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 0218458 A1 20020307; AU 8210401 A 20020313; DE 10042498 A1 20020411; EP 1315762 A1 20030604; US 2002077262 A1 20020620; US 6989274 B2 20060124

INPADOC legal status


2006-09-20 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060325

2005-07-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: LANXESS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH

2004-05-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): GB

2004-02-05 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-01-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: BAYER CHEMICALS AG

2003-06-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030331

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI